California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Victor B Kenton
Case #: 2:09-cv-07252
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2009
Terminated:Dec 07, 2009

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
46 46 service Writ Returned Thu 01/28 2:57 PM
ALIAS writ of execution issued 4/6/10 Returned Unexecuted (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2011
45 45 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) re enforcement of judgment re levy served on Wells Fargo Bank NA and mailed on 4/7/10 (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (lc) (Main Document 45 replaced on 6/30/2015) (ig). Modified on 6/30/2015 (ig).
Related: [-]
44 44 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation of Notice of Levy, Writ of Execution (Alias) served on 4/7/10 by mail. (ir)
Related: [-]
43 43 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation served Notice of Levy, Writ of Execution (Alias), Memorandum of Garnishee on Wells Fargo Bank on 4/7/10. (ir)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2011
42 42 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. as to Air Moving Equipment Company & Supply Inc., Bankruptcy Court case number 11 11-13707 (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2011
41 41 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation and against Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc. in the principal amount of $ 91,530.47, interest in the amount of $.00, attorneys fees of $ 1,000.00, costs of $ 428.44. RE: Clerks Entry of Default Judgment18 (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (lc) (Main Document 41 replaced on 6/30/2015) (ig). Modified on 6/30/2015 (ig).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2011
40 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that the document entitled ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT/ORDER RE: WRIT ISSUED, filed on March 22, 2011, docket number38 was electronically filed incorrectly and therefore ordered STRICKEN from the docket. Counsel shall review the electronic filing procedures and re-file the document forthwith. (lc)
Related: [-]
39 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document38 . The following error(s) was found: PDF is an abstract to be issued. Incorrect event and incorrect procedure selected. Abstracts are to be manually taken to Records Department for issuing.In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2011
38 38 Abstract of Judgment/Order re: Writ Issued (Palumbo, Diane) Modified on 3/23/2011 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 3/23/11 MINUTES)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2011
37 37 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation, re Order on Motion for Contempt,,,,,36 Michael Lanphere served on 3/15/2011. (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2011
36 36 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ACME ENGINEERING AND MANUFACTURING CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT33 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: A twelve (12) day stay on a bench warrant is issued during which time Michael Lanphere is ordered to submit to a debtor examination on or before March 21, 2011,10:00 a.m., at 17901 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 500, Irvine, California. The bench warrant will be vacated upon completion of the debtor examination on March 21, 2011.In the event Mr. Lanphere fails to appear for this debtor examination, the stay on the bench warrant will be lifted at which point the U.S. Marshal will be instructed to bring Mr. Lanphere before the Court to show cause for willful disregard of the Courts order.Michael Lanphere was served notice by a registered process server of the August 24,2010, debtor exam proceedings and March 7, 2011 motion for contempt hearing. Mr.Lanphere is thereby further ordered to pay an amount totaling $900 to compensateAcme for Mr. Lanpheres failures to appear to appear for both proceedings. The hourly rates of each Palumbo Bergstrom LLP attorney retained to bring Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporations complaint and default against Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc., in this action are provided as follows: $900.00 (see document for fee breakdown. (lc) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2011
35 35 MINUTES OF Motion for Contempt Against Michael Lanphere Filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation33 Hearing held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (sch)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2011
34 34 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation, re First MOTION for Contempt against Michael Lanphere33 Michael Lanphere served on January 31, 2011. (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 28, 2011
33 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND First MOTION for Contempt against Michael Lanphere filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2011 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2011
32 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that the APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM AS TO MICHAEL LAMPHERE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ACME ENGINEERING AND MANUFACTURING CORPORATION SET FOR HEARING BEFORE JUDGE DEAN D. PREGERSON30 is hereby VACATED. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2011
31 31 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Michael Lamphere filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. Application set for hearing on 2/1/2011 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2010
30 30 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Michael Lamphere filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. Application set for hearing on 1/18/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2010
29 29 MINUTES OF Judgment Debtor Exam held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton:A Judgment Debtor Examination was scheduled on August 24, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for creditor, J. D. Tripoli, made his appearance. Judgment debtor, Michael Lanphere, did not make an appearance. (rh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2010
28 28 Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation served on Michael Lanphere re: Order on Application for Judgment Debtor Exam27 (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 07, 2010
27 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting26 Application for Judgment Debtor Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 8/24/2010 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (rh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2010
26 26 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Michael Lanphere as owner and sole shareholder of Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc. filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2010
25 25 AFFIDAVIT AND REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ALIAS WRIT OF EXECUTION by affiant: John D Tripoli re Clerks Entry of Default Judgment,18 filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation (lc)
Related: [-]
24 24 ORIGINAL WRIT of execution Returned (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2010
ALIAS WRIT of execution issued (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2010
23 23 ORDER AUTHORIZING REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER SERVICE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION WITHOUT NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton: granting22 Ex Parte Application for Writ (rp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2010
22 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Writ of Ex-Parte Application For Appointment Of Process Server; Points And Authorities In Support Thereof; and Declaration Of John D. Tripoli filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 25, 2010
21 21 AFFIDAVIT AND REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION by affiant: John Tripoli re Clerks Entry of Default Judgment,18 filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation (lc)
Related: [-]
WRIT of execution issued (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2009
20 20 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ $428.44 in favor of plaintiff and against defendant. (lc)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the wrong PDF of the bill of costs was attached Re: Clerks Entry of Default Judgment,18 . Incorrect image was removed and replaced with correct PDF of the default judgment by clerk, which is also attached to this notice for reference. (lc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 default judgment by clerk
18 18 DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Clerk entered in favor of Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation against defendantAir Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc. in the principal amount of $91,430.47; attorneys fees of $1000,00; costs of $428.44 for a total judgment of $92,858.91. Related to: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)12 .MD JS-6 Case (lc) (lc). (lc). (lc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/26/2010) issued writ of execution
Att: 2 (4/8/2010) issued alias writ of execution
Friday, December 04, 2009
17 17 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Bill Of Costs,
Att: 4 Proof Of Service
Wednesday, December 02, 2009
16 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Air Moving Equipment Compnay and Supply, Inc.15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief: Missing proposed default judgment with money breakdown and calculations and signature block of clerk of the court; Missing bill of costs form. Clerk is only authorized to tax re filing fee and service of process fees only, and cannot tax on the undocumented remainder of $396.31. Otherwise if default judgment is entered, proper bill of costs set per New bill of costs procedures will have to be e-filed. Clerk cannot verify the calculation re attorneys fees, attorney fees must be incompliance with this District courts local rules. Clerk could only base this deficiency notice on review of theapplication. Requesting party SHALL FILE A NEW Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2009
15 15 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Air Moving Equipment Compnay and Supply, Inc. filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of JDT in Support of ACME Application for Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Proof Of Service
Thursday, November 12, 2009
14 14 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application e-filed/filed by attorney Trent A Gudgel for Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. As of today, the court has not yet received the application fee of $185.00. Please remit the fee and this notice immediately. (vh)
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application e-filed/filed by attorney Johnson W Custer on 11/3/09 for Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. As of todays date, the court has not yet received the application fee of $185.00. Please remit the fee and this notice immediately. (vh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2009
12 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to *Defendant Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc.* (lc)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Deficiency in request for default issued in error10 ; declartion of Diane O Palumbo declares that the authorized agent for defendant confirmed receiptof service of process. Default by clerk will be processed. (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in request for entry of default9 . The following error(s) was found: Missing due diligence attempts declaration, required for substituted service on a corporation RE: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) Modified on 11/10/2009 (lc).
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2009
9 9 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc. filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. Request set for hearing on 11/16/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Diane O. Palumbo in Support of ACME Request for Default,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Proof Of Service
Tuesday, November 03, 2009
8 8 APPLICATION for attorney Trent A. Gudgel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non Resident Attorney,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 APPLICATION for attorney Johnson W. Custer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order on Application fo Non Resident Attorney to Appear,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, October 21, 2009
6 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery)1 , Summons Issued served on 10 7-2009 (Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2009
5 5 NOTICE Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(Palumbo, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, October 05, 2009
4 4 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Trent A Gudgel for Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. (ghap) Modified on 10/13/2009 (ghap).
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Johnson W Custer for Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. (ghap) Modified on 10/13/2009 (ghap).
Related: [-]
2 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation. (ghap) Modified on 10/13/2009 (ghap). (ds).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc.(Filing fee $ 350: PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Acme Engineering and Manufacturing Corporation.(ghap) Modified on 10/13/2009 (ghap). (ds). (ds).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/14/2009) Civil Cover Sheet
20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant Air Moving Equipment Company and Supply, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]