New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:02-cv-02794
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2002
Terminated:Jul 07, 2005
Consol Defendant
SICOR, INC.
Counter Claimant
AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL
Counter Claimant
HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Counter Claimant
SICOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Counter Claimant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA
Counter Defendant
DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL
Counter Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Counter Defendant
ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Defendant
AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL
Defendant
HI-TECH PHARMACAL CO., INC.
Defendant
SICOR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA
Plaintiff
DAIICHI PHARMACEUTICAL
Plaintiff
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Plaintiff
ORTHO-MCNEIL PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

GPO Jan 30 2003
MEMORANDUM OPINION (by Mag. Judge John J. Hughes) (NM) (ij) Actual MEMORANDUM OPINION attached on 2/23/2007 (ms).
GPO Mar 17 2006
OPINION, Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 3/17/06 (DH)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.