New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:02-cv-02924
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2002
Terminated:Dec 23, 2008
Defendant
AMOCO CORPORATION
Defendant
ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Defendant
ATOFINA PETROCHEMICALS INC.
Defendant
BP AMERICA, INC.
Defendant
BP CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA INC.
Defendant
CHEVRON CORPORATION
Defendant
CHEVRON USA
Defendant
CHEVRONTEXACO CORP.
Defendant
CONOCO, INC.
Defendant
CONOCOPHILLIPS
Defendant
EXXON CORP.
Defendant
EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Defendant
MARATHON OIL CO.
Defendant
MOBIL CORPORATION
Defendant
OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Defendant
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY
Defendant
SHELL OIL CO.
Defendant
SUN COMPANY, INC.(R&M)
Defendant
SUN OIL INC. (R&M)
Defendant
SUNOCO, INC. (R&M)
Defendant
TEXACO INC.
Defendant
UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA
Defendant
UNOCAL CORPORATION
Mediator
HERMAN D. MICHELS
Mediator
WILLIAM J. O'SHAUGHNESSY
Notice Only
ARTHUR PENN
Notice Only
JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION
Plaintiff
A. RUSSELL HOGE
Plaintiff
DENNIS ALLAN LETNEY
Plaintiff
DONALD R. BAILEY
Plaintiff
EDDIE ALLEN
Plaintiff
JAMES DARTEZ SR.
Plaintiff
JIMMY NMN WALTERS
Plaintiff
KENNETH L. HILLSTEN
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DOYLE
Plaintiff
ROBERT NMN TRAHAN
Plaintiff
ROBERTA TODD
Plaintiff
THOMAS J. RYAN

GPO Jan 05 2006
OPINION re 112 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 1/4/06. (ck )
GPO Feb 15 2006
OPINION re 122 First MOTION for Reconsideration filed by DONALD R. BAILEY, . Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 2/15/06. (ck )
GPO Aug 20 2008
OPINION filed. Signed by Chief Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 8/19/2008. (tp )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.