Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:12-bk-11868
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Mar 13, 2013
Claims Deadline:Jun 11, 2013
Converted:Jan 15, 2013
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C.
6711 Ritz Way
Beltsville, MD 20705-1318
Represented By
Marion M. Quirk
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
Therese Anne Scheuer
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info
Sanjay Bhatnagar
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info
Irving Walker
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard,
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Cathy R. Hershcopf
Cooley LLP
contact info
Tyler D. Semmelman
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Brent Ian Weisenberg
Cooley LLP
contact info
Jay R. Indyke
Cooley LLP
contact info
Christopher M. Samis
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Dana S Katz
Cooley LLP
contact info
Trustee
Alfred T. Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee
Trustee
Alfred Thomas Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091
Represented By
John V. Fiorella
Archer & Greiner
contact info
Jennifer L. Dering
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Michael Seidl
Pachulski, Stang,ziehl,young & Jones
contact info
David W. Carickhoff
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Alfred Thomas Giuliano
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091
Represented By
John V. Fiorella
Archer & Greiner
contact info
Jennifer L. Dering
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info
Michael Seidl
Pachulski, Stang,ziehl,young & Jones
contact info
David W. Carickhoff
Archer & Greiner P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 09/18/2015 3:39 PM EDT
Friday, June 22, 2012
Judge Kevin Gross added to case. (LA)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1046. Filed by Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
2 2 7 pgs Motion for Joint Administration Motion of the Debtors for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Their Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 Application to Employ/Retain Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
4 4 Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Services, (II) Deeming Utility Providers Adequately Assured of Future Performance, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
5 5 Motion to Pay Employee Wages Debtors Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Wages, Compensation, Employee Benefits, Expense Reimbursement and Related Items, and the Continuation of Certain Employment Policies in the Ordinary Course, and (II) Authorizing and Directing Applicable Banks to Honor and Pay All Checks and Payment Requests With Respect Thereto Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Prepetition Shipping Charges and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 Motion to Continue Customer Programs Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Honor Customer Programs and Practices Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C.(Bhatnagar, Sanjay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Debtors Motion for an Order (A) Authorizing Debtors to Continue Use of Their Centralized Cash Management System, Existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms, and (B) Waiving, on an Interim Basis, the Deposit and Investment Requirements of Section 345 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C.(Bhatnagar, Sanjay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
9 9 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-11868 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt Number 6030496, amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice of Appearance Filed by Federal Realty Investment Trust, Brixmor Property Group, Inc.. (Pollack, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of Appearance Filed by GGP Limited Partnership. (Pate, Kristen)
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice of Appearance Filed by Simon Property Group, Inc.. (Tucker, Ronald)
Related: [-]
13 13 Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Pursuant to Sections 105, 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rules 2002, 4001 and 9014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing Postpetition Financing and Granting Postpetition Security Interests; (B) Modifying the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362; (C) Authorizing Debtors to Enter Into Agreement With Crystal Financial LLC, and (D) Scheduling a Final Hearing Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 4001 Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+] Modified on 6/26/2012 (SB).
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
14 14 Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion of Marc Weinsweig, Chief Restructuring Officer Filed By Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
15 15 Notice of Hearing to Consider First Day Motions and Related Pleadings Related [+] Filed by Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 6/25/2012 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bhatnagar, Sanjay)
Related: [-] 1 ,2 ,3 ,4 ,5 ,6 ,7 ,8 ,13 ,14
16 16 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Ritz Camera & Image, L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 6/25/2012 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
17 17 Notice of Appearance Filed by Westfield, LLC and Certain Affiliates. (Ferland, Niclas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule A - List of Affiliates
18 18 Notice of Appearance Filed by Highland Park ISD. (Banda Calvo, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
19 19 Notice of Appearance Filed by Cousins Properties Incorporated, The Forbes Company, The Macerich Company. (Branch, Dustin)
Related: [-]
20 20 Notice of Appearance Filed by Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC, Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
Related: [-]
21 21 Affidavit/Declaration of Service re 1) Notice of Hearing to Consider First Day Motions and Related Pleadings; to be Held on June 25, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. (ET); and 2) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for First Day Hearing on June 25, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. (ET) Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 15 ,16