California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:09-cv-05452
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2009
Terminated:Apr 21, 2010
Defendant
"C.A.M.P."
Defendant
"C.O.M.M.E.T."
Defendant
Brad James
Defendant
Brian Casey
Defendant
Charles Ben Burch
Defendant
Charlie Bone
Defendant
City of Ukiah
Defendant
County of Mendocino
Defendant
Dale Shepard
Defendant
Dennis Miller
Defendant
Drug Enforcement Agency
Defendant
Eduardo Roy
Defendant
Fred Keplinger
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
Defendant
James Noe
Defendant
James R. Price
Defendant
James Tuso
Defendant
Janet Reno
Defendant
Jim Shweig
Defendant
John Goldberg
Defendant
Jonathan R. Howden
Defendant
K. C. Smith
Defendant
Mark Haigh
Defendant
Mark Nelson
Defendant
Mark Vanoni
Defendant
Michael Yamaguchi
Defendant
Nicholas Console Jr.
Defendant
Owen Woodruff
Defendant
Peter Hoyle
Defendant
Peter Ott
Defendant
Robert Franzen
Defendant
Robert Kursar
Defendant
Ron Caudillo
Defendant
Scott Pomo
Defendant
Stephen D'Erichia
Defendant
Tim Kiely
Defendant
Trent Taylor
Defendant
United States of America
Defendant
Wayne Brown
Defendant
William Rutler
Plaintiff
John William Dalton

GPO Apr 21 2010
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS 3 AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2010: # (1) cs) (ysS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 21 2010
JUDGMENT: This action is dismissed without leave to amend. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.