Member Case
Lead case is: 4:11-bk-38111

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Cecelia G Morris
Case #: 4:12-bk-36728
Case Filed:Jul 06, 2012
Claims Deadline:Aug 01, 2012
Terminated:Jul 07, 2014
Plan Confirmed:Sep 10, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Dynegy Inc.
601 Travis St Ste 1400
Houston, TX 77002-3253
Represented By
Julia M Winters
White & Case LLP
contact info
J. Christopher Shore
White & Case LLP
contact info
Debtor
Dynegy Holdings, LLC
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Brian J. Lohan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Julia M Winters
White & Case LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims and Noticing Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent)
757 Third Avenue Third Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Julia M Winters
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ron Jacobs
contact info
Claims and Noticing Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor www.epiqsystems.com
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Julia M Winters
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ron Jacobs
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
74 Chapel Street
Albany, NY 12207
Represented By
Eric J. Small
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Feb 15 2013
Memorandum Decision Signed on 2/15/2013 Denying Debtor's Motion to Enforce the COnfirmation Order. (Colon, Gwen)

Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 09, 2014
309 309 misc Operating Report Tue 09/09 1:13 PM
Monthly Operating Report for June 2014 filed by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of Dynegy Inc.. (Shore, J.)
Related: [-]