California Central District Court
Judge:Nora M Manella
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:01-cv-08488
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2001
Terminated:Feb 19, 2002

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 19, 2002
17 17 1 pgs JUDGMENT AND ORDER: by Judge Nora M. Manella . denying & dismissing habeas corpus petition [1-1] w/o prej terminating case (MD JS-6) (ENT 2/20/02) (cc: all counsel) (dmjr)
Related: [-]
16 16 7 pgs ORDER by Judge Nora M. Manella adopting [14-1] R&R (ENT 2/20/02) (dmjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 15, 2002
15 15 9 pgs NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order; Any party having objs to the R & R & the proposed jgm &/or ord shall NLT 20 days file & svc a written stmt of objs w/PA (dw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2002
14 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issd by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick (dw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2001
13 13 NOTICE by respondent OF LODGING PETR'S 2ND OPP TO MOT TO RESP'S MOT TO DISM; EXHIBITS (dw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2001
12 12 NOTICE by resp McGrath of lodging petr's opp to mot to resp's mot to dism; exhs. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2001
11 11 1 pgs MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: The Crt is in receipt of Resp's "Mot to Dism" etc fld 11/27/01; Petr shall file opp to the mot w/in 30 days of the date of this ord; At that time the Crt will take the mot under subm w/o oral argument unless the Crt otherwise orders; Failure to file timely opp to the mot may result in denial & dism of the Petn; Resp need not file an Ans to the Petn under fur ord of this Crt; CR: N/A (SEND) (dw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2001
10 10 MEMORANDUM of PA in suppt by respondent of motion to dismiss Petn for Writ of H/C [9-1], motion to request a stay of Crt's ord fld 10/2/01 [9-2] (dw)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by respondent to dismiss Petn for Writ of H/C , and to request a stay of the Crt's ord fld 10/2/01 requiring an ans in this matter; motion hearing set for 9:00 12/28/01 (dw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2001
8 8 RETURN RECEIPT of Certified Mail showing delivery to Office of the A/G Head of the CR Div CA St Dept of Justice rcd by Ranel Carreon of copy of petn & 2 ords on 10/11/01 (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2001
7 7 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Motion for Speedy Trial rcd 10/29/01 is NOT to be fld but instead REJECTED & is ORDERED returned to cnsl; (SEND) (dw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2001
6 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick granting ex parte application for extension of time to file ans/responsive pleading to petn for writ of h/c [5-1] on or before 11/28/01. Petr Traverse or opp is due w/n 15 days of the date the ans is filed. (pbap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2001
5 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by respondent McGrath for extension of time to file ans/responsive pleading to petn for writ of h/c Lodged prop ord (pbap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2001
4 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick that Respondent file an Ans to the Petn w/n 23 days of the date of this Ord. FUR ORD that, if Petr desire to file a Traverse to the Ans, he shall do so w/n 15 days of the date that the Ans is filed. (pbap)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick petr shall file a proof of svc with every docs subm to crt (dmjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2001
2 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick (jag)
Related: [-]
1 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by petitioner Jimmie Lee Adams Sr in State Custody referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick . (jag)
Related: [-]