California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:00-cv-04117
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2000
Terminated:Mar 17, 2008
Defendant
. Alozo
Defendant
. Bachelor
Defendant
. Barnhart
Defendant
. Brooks
Defendant
. Cadegari
Defendant
. Dixion
Defendant
. Gattey
Defendant
. Hays
Defendant
. Hoos
Defendant
. Jacobs
Defendant
. Jensen
Defendant
. Johnson
Defendant
. Khangura
Defendant
. Kings Jr.
Defendant
. Mattison
Defendant
. Morrison
Defendant
. Norton
Defendant
. Perez
Defendant
. Ransfer
Defendant
. Rhodes
Defendant
. Rocha
Defendant
. Shephard
Defendant
. Skoldquist
Defendant
. Staysa
Defendant
. Suchman
Defendant
. Tally
Defendant
. Verburg
Defendant
. Vincent
Defendant
. Williams
Defendant
. Wright
Defendant
. Zuniga
Defendant
Alameda County Public Defenders Office
Defendant
Alameda County Sheriff Department
Defendant
B. Chun
Defendant
Barnes
Defendant
Brock
Defendant
C. Krieger
Defendant
Charles Plummer
Defendant
Churich
Defendant
Dagneau
Defendant
Dave Fife
Defendant
Judith Ford
Defendant
Kenneth Kingsbury
Defendant
Kimmel
Defendant
L. Goodspeed
Defendant
M. Nichelini
Defendant
Martinez
Defendant
Nurse Practioner at North County Jail
Defendant
Nurse Practioner at Santa Rita Jail
Defendant
Oakland Police Dept
Defendant
Philip Adams
Defendant
Prisoner Health Services
Defendant
Raymond Keller
Defendant
Steven Scheibel
Miscellaneous
Federal Bureau Prisons
Plaintiff
Johnny L. Sloan Jr.

GPO Feb 24 2006
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 356 Motion for Summary Judgment (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2017: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Mar 23 2006
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 361 Motion to Dismiss Complaint or for Other Sanctions (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2006 (klh, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 11 2007
(Filed on 1/11/2007)ORDER requiring warden of High Desert State Prison to deliver Plaintiff to Sherriff of Alameda County. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 11, 2007. (Attachments: # (1) order for writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum)(crblc2, COURT STAFF)
GPO Jan 12 2007
ORDER Regarding Equipment for Trial. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007)
GPO Jan 19 2007
ORDER to Allow Counsel an In-Person Visit. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2007)
GPO Feb 01 2007
ORDER vacating judgment. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
GPO Oct 26 2007
WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED. SEE DOCKET 495 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/26/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2007) Modified on 10/29/2007 (scc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/29/2007 (cp, COURT STAFF).
GPO Oct 29 2007
ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, WRIT issued. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/26/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
GPO Nov 05 2007
ORDER by Judge WILKEN granting 499 Motion REFER CASE TO MAGISTRATE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2007)
GPO Nov 14 2007
ORDER for Settlement Conference set for 11/26/2007 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas at High Desert State Prison.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/14/07. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
GPO Nov 14 2007
ORDER for Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2007 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/14/07. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
GPO Nov 14 2007
Order to issue writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
GPO Nov 27 2007
STIPULATION TO AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/27/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
GPO Nov 28 2007
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/28/07. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
GPO Dec 10 2007
NOTICE REGARDING INABILITY TO SERVE DEFENDANT DAVE FIFE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/10/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2007)
GPO Dec 10 2007
ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES MARSHAL TO PERSONALLY SERVE DEFENDANT DAVE FIFE PURSUANT TO FRCP 4(e)(2). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/10/07. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2007)
GPO Feb 13 2008
ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES MARSHAL TO PERSONALLY SERVE DEFENDANT DAVE FIFE PURSUANT TO FRCP 4(e)(2). Motions terminated: 523 MOTION for service on defendant Dave Fife filed by Johnny L. Sloan, Jr... Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/13/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2008)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.