Chisholm et al v. St. Marys City School District Board of Education et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James G Carr |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01665 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2016 3:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Shawn Brown
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bo Frye
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paul Douglas Frye
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Hollman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Marys City School District Board of Education
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dane Chisholm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Chisholm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Levi Ginter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jase Green
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chance Hicks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Lininger
|
Represented By
|
1. | Former football players file federal lawsuit against various St. Marys City School District officials, alleging that they were subject to harassment (limaohio.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/30/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 11/28 11:26 AM
Order and Notice of Case Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1). Judge James G. Carr on 11/28/18. (C,D) |
|
Friday, November 23, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Fri 11/23 12:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Dismissal
Thu 06/28 3:25 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Joshua Chisholm. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Minute Order _ Status Conference
Thu 06/21 1:43 PM
Order of Status Conference held on 6/19/18. Time: 20 Minutes. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2018, Opposition due 10/1/18 Replies due by 10/15/2018. Judge James G. Carr on 6/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(C,D) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Deposition
Thu 03/29 10:59 AM
Notice to take Deposition of Plaintiff Dane Chisholm on April 12, 2018 filed by Paul Douglas Frye. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(Beach, William) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
~Util - Terminate Motions Minute Order _ Status Conference
Wed 12/13 3:57 PM
Order of Status Conference held on 12/11/17. Time: 30 Minutes. Parties to complete discovery re. summary judgment by 7/1/2018. Motions for summary judgment due 8/1/18; opposition briefs due9/4/18; and replies due 9/18/18. Defendant's motion for a protective order (Doc.23 ) be, and the same hereby is, denied without prejudice. Leave granted to plaintiff to conduct fact deposition of Robert Valentine in accordance with the guidelines discussed during the December 11, 2017, conference. Initial settlement conference to be held at the request of any party. Judge James G. Carr on 12/13/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(C,D) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Status Report
Wed 12/06 11:15 AM
Status Report filed by Paul Douglas Frye. (Beach, William) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Status Report
Wed 12/06 11:03 AM
Status Report of Defendants filed by James Hollman, St. Marys City School District Board of Education, Shawn Brown. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(Justice, Tabitha) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Protective Order
Wed 12/06 10:57 AM
Motion for protective order filed by Defendant St. Marys City School District Board of Education.Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(Justice, Tabitha) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
22 | 22
notice
Status Report
Wed 12/06 10:36 AM
Status Report filed by Joshua Chisholm. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Mon 11/20 10:48 AM
Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 09:00 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC (C,D) |
||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension (other)
Fri 11/17 3:01 PM
Motion for extension of time until indefinite to indefinite filed by Plaintiff Joshua Chisholm. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minute Order _ Discovery Conference
Fri 06/23 9:53 AM
Order of Discovery Conference held on 6/21/17 Time: 1 hour. Appearing that the discovery disputes have been resolved, no further order withregard to those disputes is necessary. Upon motion of plaintiffs' counsel and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), plaintiff Chance Hicks is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Proceedings as to plaintiff Dane Chisholm be held in abeyance due to performanceof his military obligation pending further court order. Judge James G. Carr on 6/23/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02851-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(C,D) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 06/20 3:55 PM
Attorney Appearance by Amy L.J. Luck filed by on behalf of Paul Douglas Frye. (Luck, Amy) |
|
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Tue 06/20 2:31 PM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Discovery Dispute teleconference set for 6/21/2017 at 9:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr using the court's conference line. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02851-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC (C,D) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 06/06 2:23 PM
Notice of Service of Doug Frye's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Requests for Production of Documents and First Requests for Admissions and First Set of Interrogatories filed by Paul Douglas Frye. (Beach, William) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/20 3:34 PM
Attorney Appearance by William V. Beach filed by on behalf of Paul Douglas Frye. (Beach, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/19 4:05 PM
Attorney Appearance and Notice of Substitution as Trial Attorney by Thomas J. Antonini filed by on behalf of Bo Frye, Paul Douglas Frye. (Antonini, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
~Util - Terminate Motions Protective Order
Wed 01/04 4:54 PM
Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Judge James G. Carr on 1/4/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02851-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(C,D) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Protective Order
Wed 01/04 1:25 PM
Unopposed Motion for protective order filed by Shawn Brown, James Hollman, St. Marys City School District Board of Education.(Justice, Tabitha) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 01/03 2:01 PM
Attorney Appearance by Sanford A. Meizlish and Jason C. Cox filed on behalf of Joshua Chisholm, David Lininger, Chance Hicks, Jase Green, Levi Ginter and Dane Chisholm. (Meizlish, Sanford) Modified text to add attorney name and filers on 1/3/2017 (M,L) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Case Management Conference Plan/Order
Wed 12/28 11:56 AM
Order: Case is assigned to the complex track. Discovery, including expert discovery, to be completed by December 1, 2017; agreed protective order or notice of disagreement needing court's attention, to be submitted by January 4, 2017. Defendants' dispositive motions due 1/30/18; opposition and counter-motion, if any, due 2/28/18; reply and opposition to counter-motion, if any, due 3/20/18; reply re counter-motion due 4/2/18. Status conference set for Monday, December 4, 2017, at 1:30 p.m.; parties to submit status reports by noon, Wednesday, November 29, 2017. Judge James G. Carr on 12/28/16. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-01665-JGC, 3:16-cv-02849-JGC, 3:16-cv-02851-JGC, 3:16-cv-02852-JGC, 3:16-cv-02853-JGC(C,D) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 12/05 2:53 PM
Answer and Jury Demand of Defendant Doug Frye to First Amended Complaint Answer to8 Amended complaint filed by Paul Douglas Frye. (Antonini, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 12/05 1:11 PM
Answer to8 Amended complaint of Plaintiff Joshua Chisholm filed by Shawn Brown, James Hollman, St. Marys City School District Board of Education. (Justice, Tabitha) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Thu 12/01 2:45 PM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Status Conference RESET for 12/12/2016 at 02:30 PM in to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr using the court's conference line 1-877-336-1839 Access Code 8856866. (C,D) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Wed 11/30 10:46 PM
Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Joshua Chisholm. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Sunday, November 27, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Sun 11/27 11:27 PM
|
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/22 3:20 PM
First Amended complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Shawn Brown, Paul Douglas Frye, James Hollman, St. Marys City School District Board of Education. Filed by Joshua Chisholm. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minute Order _ Status Conference
Wed 10/05 12:02 PM
Order of Status Conference held on 10/3/16. Time: 20 MinutesFurther Status Conference set for 12/7/2016 at 02:00 PM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr using the court's conference line (1-877-336-1839, Access Code 8856866). Parties granted leave to submit proposed schedule(s) by December 1, 2016, by noon;. Leave granted to other named plaintiffs to file individual complaints on or before 12/1/2016. Parties to exchange Rule 26 disclosures by December 1, 2016. Leave granted to parties to conduct discovery by agreement in all cases pending conference set for December 7, 2016. Leave granted to parties on agreement to take discovery, as needed in each case, inexcess of the limits otherwise imposed under the Federal and Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Judge James G. Carr on 10/5/16. (C,D) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Notice of Hearing or Conference
Thu 09/29 8:08 PM
Notice [non-document] of Status Conference set for 10/3/2016 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically before Judge James G. Carr. The court will initiate the call to the numbers indicated on the docket unless alternate contact information has been provided to JudgeCarr_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov (C,D) |
||
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/29 4:10 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Bo Frye, Paul Douglas Frye. (Antonini, Thomas) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/29 10:43 AM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Shawn Brown, James Hollman, St. Marys City School District Board of Education. (Justice, Tabitha) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/26 4:38 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Bo Frye waiver sent on 7/1/2016, answer due 8/30/2016; Paul Douglas Frye waiver sent on 7/1/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/18 5:48 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Shawn Brown waiver sent on 7/1/2016, answer due 8/30/2016; James Hollman waiver sent on 7/1/2016, answer due 8/30/2016; St. Marys City School District Board of Education waiver sent on 7/1/2016, answer due 8/30/2016. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Thu 07/14 3:25 PM
Notice to Attorney Leslie A. Albeit. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s)1 . (G,CA) |
||
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Wed 06/29 3:18 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L) |
|
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/29 1:34 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Shawn Brown, Bo Frye, Paul Douglas Frye, James Hollman, St. Marys City School District Board of Education. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-7691236. Filed by Chance Hicks, David Lininger, Dane Chisholm, Joshua Chisholm, Levi Ginter, Jase Green. (Weiker, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A and B | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 06/29 2:56 PM
Judge James G. Carr assigned to case. (L,A) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/29 3:00 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (L,A) |
||
oth_evt
Notice re Prompt Service
Wed 06/29 3:19 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (L,A) |