Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Katherine A Constantine
Case #: 4:13-bk-41898
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2013
Creditor Meeting:May 20, 2013
Claims Deadline:Aug 19, 2013
Terminated:Nov 28, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Nov 14, 2013
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 19, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Antioch Company, LLC
6401 8th Ave
Saint Cloud, MN 56301-7729
Represented By
Sarah M Gibbs
Fredrikson & Bryon P A
contact info
Clinton E. Cutler
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Manju Gupta
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Michael J Kaczka
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Douglas W Kassebaum
Fredrikson & Byron P.A.
contact info
Fredrikson & Byron PA
contact info
Sean D. Malloy
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
McDonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Debtor
CLINTON CUTLER
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A. 200 South Sixth Street Ste. 4000
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Clinton E. Cutler
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2013 4:09 AM CDT
Creditor Committee
Dawn Oldham
7537 Pointview Circle
Orlando, FL 32836
Creditor Committee
Karis Bellisario
3409 Ramsgate Way
Fort Smith, AR 72902
Creditor Committee
Christy Keyton
4 Woodmere Dr
Dothan, AL 36305
Creditor Committee
LF Centennial Pte, LTD
12 Princeton Drive
Tappan, NY 10983
Creditor Committee
Range Printing
1022 Madison Street
Brainerd, MN 56401
Represented By
Steven R Qualley
Gammello Qualley & Pearson PLLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Lynelle S Johnson
15545 Quickert Rd
Saratoga, CA 95070
Creditor Committee
UNSECURED CREDITOR COMMITTEE
2200 WELLS FARGO CENTER 90 SOUTH SEVENTH STREET
MINNEAPOLIS, MN 55402
Represented By
Eric J Howe
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Abby E Wilkinson
Faegre & Benson
contact info
Michael B Fisco
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee Chair
Sharon Holmlund
1315 Cassins Street
Carlsbad, CA 92011
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Michael R Fadlovich
Us Trustee Office
contact info


1. Bankruptcy judge approves Creative Memories reorganization (sctimes.com)
Submitted Thu 11/14/2013
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:02 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
court MNB Close bankruptcy case Wed 11/28 1:21 PM
IT IS ORDERED: The case is closed and the trustee (if a trustee has been appointed) is discharged. (Debbie MNBS)
Related: [-]