Original Case: 1:14-cv-05902

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-02243
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2016
Terminated:Apr 04, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Apr 06, 2017 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
World Fuel Services, Inc.
Represented By
Peter Benjamin Dewitt Duke
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Martin Howard Myers
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Marienna Harnden Murch
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
World Fuel Services Europe, Ltd
Represented By
Peter Benjamin Dewitt Duke
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Martin Howard Myers
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Marienna Harnden Murch
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By
Nooshin Namazi
Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney
contact info
John A.V. Nicoletti
Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney
contact info
Kevin John Byron O'Malley
Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/06/2017 4:30 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant World Fuel Services Europe, Ltd and World Fuel Services, Inc. in 16-2243 FILED. [1805050] 16-2243 16-1902 --[Edited 06/29/2016 by LCH] [Entered: 06/29/2016 11:11 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 05/17/2016, RECEIVED.[1805057] 16-2243 16-1902 [Entered: 06/29/2016 11:14 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1805059] 16-2243 16-1902 [Entered: 06/29/2016 11:15 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant World Fuel Services Europe, Ltd and World Fuel Services, Inc. in 16-2243 USCA receipt # 020812475676, FILED.[1805061] 16-2243 16-1902 [Entered: 06/29/2016 11:16 AM]
Related: [-]