North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Craig Whitley
Case #: 3:16-bk-31100
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Oct 19, 2016
Claims Deadline:Jan 16, 2017
Terminated:Oct 23, 2019

Debtor
Bradley Construction Inc
1111 Hawthorne Ln
Charlotte, NC 28205-2971
Represented By
Bradley Construction Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Ranger Concrete LLC
Represented By
James H. Henderson
James H. Henderson, P.C.
contact info
Lee A. Peindl
Mcgrath & Spielberger, PLLC
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Carolina's Top Shelf Custom Cabinets, Inc.
101 Weatherly Square
Ramseur, NC 27316
Represented By
James H. Henderson
James H. Henderson, P.C.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Air Charlotte Mechanical Services, Inc.
604 Old Providence Road PO Box 895
Waxhaw, NC 28173
Represented By
James H. Henderson
James H. Henderson, P.C.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
B.A. Hoft of Charlotte, Inc.
128 Commercial Drive, Suite 100
Mooresville, NC 28115
Represented By
James H. Henderson
James H. Henderson, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
A. Burton Shuford
4700 Lebanon Road, Suite #A-2
Mint Hill, NC 28227
Represented By
A. Burton Shuford
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
402 W. Trade Street Suite 200
Charlotte, NC 28202


Docket last updated: 07/20/2016 8:32 AM EDT
Friday, July 01, 2016
Receipt of Filing Fee for Involuntary Petition 16-31100 [misc,invPet] ( 335.00). Receipt number 7306639, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Involuntary Petition Under Chapter 7 Filing Fee Amount $ 335 Filed by (Henderson, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Exhibit(s) to Involuntary Petiton Related [+] filed by James H. Henderson on behalf of Bradley Construction Inc. (Henderson, James)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary Petition filed by Debtor Bradley Construction Inc
3 3 notice Request for Notice/Appearance Fri 07/01 5:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Lee A. Peindl on behalf of B.A. Hoft of Charlotte, Inc.. (Peindl, Lee)
Related: [-]