New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:16-cv-03970
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2016
Terminated:May 24, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 4:21 AM EST
Defendant
ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By
JONATHAN STEVEN LISS
Gibbons, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
RALPH T. IANNELLI
Represented By
JONATHAN STEVEN LISS
Gibbons, P.C.
contact info
MICHAEL R. GRIFFINGER
Gibbons, PC
contact info
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER
23 Drake Road
Mendham, NJ 07945
Represented By
ROBYN GNUDI KALOCSAY
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
GENE KYLE KASKIW
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLC
contact info
PETER B. VANDEVENTER, JR.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
38 38 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 07/25 11:29 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 07/25/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
37 37 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/24 3:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 03, 2018
36 36 misc Stipulation Tue 07/03 11:55 AM
STIPULATION re35 Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Consent Order regarding Terms of Settlement by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
35 35 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 05/24 9:00 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/23/2018. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 05/23/2018. (ek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/17 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Settlement Conference held on 5/16/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
34 34 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/26 3:32 PM
LETTER ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/16/2018 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. All counsel and clients with full settlement authority shall be present, in person at the conference. By no later than 5/10/2018, the parties are to submit separate confidential ex parte settlement position papers not to exceed five (5) pages. Such letters are not to be filed, but are to be sent directly to Chambers via email (JBC_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov) or by fax (973-645-3020). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/26/2018. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
33 33 1 pgs misc Letter Thu 03/22 12:16 PM
Letter from Jonathan S. Liss, Esq. to Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J.. (LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 03/23 8:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 3/20/2018. (seb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
32 32 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/15 11:36 AM
LETTER ORDER re30 Letter,31 Letter. The Court will address Counsels' request during a conference call scheduled for 3/20/18 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/15/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
31 31 1 pgs misc Letter Mon 02/12 2:29 PM
Letter from Jonathan S. Liss, Esq. to Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J.. (LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2018
30 30 2 pgs misc Letter Fri 02/09 4:55 PM
Letter from Peter B. Van Deventer, Jr. to Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. regarding Mediation Result. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
29 29 misc Letter Tue 01/30 3:24 PM
Letter from Peter B. Van Deventer, Jr. to Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J.. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/30 2:36 PM
ORDER referring case to Mediation and appointing Sheryl M. Goski, Esq. as the Mediation. The discovery in this matter is stayed pending the conclusion of the mediation. The11 MOTION to Dismiss is administratively terminated w/out prejudice, and w/in 30 days from the conclusion of the mediation, defendant Iannelli may submit a letter to the Court requesting the reinstatement of his motion to dismiss; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/30/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Tue 01/30 10:00 AM
Letter from Michael R. Griffinger, Esq. to Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J.. (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
order Order Appointing Mediator Tue 01/30 3:39 PM
Clerk's Note: Entry made for computer purposes. Order Appointing Mediator (th, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
26 26 2 pgs misc Letter Mon 01/29 1:09 PM
Letter from Peter Van Deventer, Jr., Esq.. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/26 10:04 AM
ORDER rescheduling the 1/31/18 Settlement Conference to 3/20/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark, and Confidential Settlement Letters shall be due by 3/15/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/26/18. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
24 24 misc Letter Tue 01/23 10:26 AM
Letter from Jonathan S. Liss, Esq. to Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J.. (LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
23 23 misc Letter Mon 11/27 4:38 PM
Letter from Jonathan S. Liss, Esq. to Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re22 Letter. (LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
22 22 2 pgs misc Letter Wed 11/22 3:36 PM
Letter from Peter B. Van Deventer, Jr. to Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. regarding November 20, 2017 Conference. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/20 2:01 PM
LETTER ORDER, scheduling an in-person Settlement Conference on 1/31/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/20/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 11/21 7:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2017. (seb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2017
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/10 4:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER re11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Sur Reply of Plaintiff as Authorized by Judge Cecchi(VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 03, 2017
19 19 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/03 1:32 PM
ORDER permitting Plaintiff Kenneth VanDeventer to file a sur-reply re: motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/3/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
18 18 misc Letter Wed 11/01 3:18 PM
Letter from Peter B. Van Deventer, Jr. to Hon. Claire C. Cecchi regarding request to file sur reply. (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
17 17 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 10/30 3:39 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RALPH T. IANNELLI re11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ralph T. Iannelli,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 16, 2017
16 16 misc Letter Mon 10/16 4:29 PM
Letter from Jonathan S. Liss, Esq. to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 10/13 11:20 AM
ORDER adjourning the current Motion to Dismiss to next returnable date of 11/6/17, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/13/17. (cm, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/13 11:21 AM
Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
14 14 misc Letter Tue 10/10 3:44 PM
Letter from Jonathan S. Liss to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2017
13 13 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 10/09 2:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER re11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2017
12 12 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 09/14 9:49 AM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2017 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/14/2017. (seb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/12 8:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to11 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint . Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 09/11 12:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by RALPH T. IANNELLI.(GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 01, 2017
10 10 13 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/01 4:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER.(VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 10, 2017
9 9 order Order Appointing Mediator Mon 04/10 3:51 PM
Mediation and Scheduling Order referring case to Mediation and Appointing Mediator, SHERYL M. GOSKI, and terminating6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended Complaint w/in 30 days of the date of this Order, and Defendants shall have 30 days from the conclusion of the mediation to answer or otherwise move to dismiss the amended pleading; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/10/17. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
minutes Status Conference Tue 05/02 12:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 4/5/2017. (jl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2016
8 8 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 10/10 3:22 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RALPH T. IANNELLI re6 MOTION to Dismiss (GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 03, 2016
7 7 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 10/03 7:08 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER re6 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6)(VANDEVENTER, PETER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Peter B. Van Deventer in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Certification of Peter B. Van Deventer,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Certification of Peter B. Van Deventer,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 19, 2016
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 09/19 12:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by RALPH T. IANNELLI.(GRIFFINGER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Ralph T. Ianelli's Memorandum of Law in Support of His Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Certification of Jonathan S. Liss,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/19 2:37 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
5 5 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 09/01 2:03 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney JONATHAN STEVEN LISS for ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION,JONATHAN STEVEN LISS for RALPH T. IANNELLI added.(LISS, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 09/01 2:46 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by RALPH T. IANNELLI, ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/19/16. (sr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/08 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBYN GNUDI KALOCSAY on behalf of KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER (KALOCSAY, ROBYN)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/08 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GENE KYLE KASKIW on behalf of KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER (KASKIW, GENE)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/01 1:17 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION, RALPH T. IANNELLI Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/01 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against ESSEX CAPITAL CORPORATION, RALPH T. IANNELLI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7202646) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KENNETH M VAN DEVENTER.(jr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Referred to Arbitration Fri 07/01 1:17 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
Related: [-]