Pherah, LLC v. Sopheon Corporation
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-00981 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 3:24 AM CST |
Defendant
Sopheon Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Pherah, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 11/14 8:35 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, ) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 11/14 8:31 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/10/16. (mll, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 11/08 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pherah, LLC (Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 11/02 12:22 PM
ORDER granting in part11 Motion to Continue and Stay Deadlines. All pending deadlines in this case are STAYED through 11 17-2016 Barring exceptional events, no further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/02/16. (mll, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 11/02 9:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 11/2/2016. Messrs. Chaudhari and Crawford appeared as counsel for the parties. The Court granted the parties an additional 15 days from which to finalize settlement documents. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 11/01 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/2/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***The Court's telephone number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances.*** (jml) |
||
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Fri 10/28 4:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Stay of All Deadlines by Pherah, LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 09/30 10:25 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Stay. All unreached deadlines between Pherah LLC and Sopheon Corporation are STAYED until 11 02-2016 so that they may document the agreement and submit appropriate dismissal papers. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/30/16. (mll, ) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stay
Thu 09/29 2:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Pherah, LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 09/16 9:04 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline to submit the answer to the Complaint is hereby extended to 10 03-2016 Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/15/16. (mll, ) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Fri 09/16 9:05 AM
Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sopheon Corporation to 10/3/2016. (mll, ) |
||
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/14 3:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Pherah, LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 08/23 4:49 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sopheon Corporation to 9/17/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, ) |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 08/18 3:14 PM
Joint Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pherah, LLC and Sopheon Corporation.( Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 08/03 10:43 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint4 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sopheon Corporation to 9/2/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant)( mll, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 07/27 10:57 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 07/26 4:51 PM
Joint Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pherah, LLC and Sopheon Corporation.( Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/15 5:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pherah, LLC (Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/07 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Sopheon Corporation, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/05 4:05 PM
Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (mll, ) |
||
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/01 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sopheon Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5818775.), filed by Pherah, LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |