Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-00649 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2013 |
Re-opened: | Dec 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 06, 2015 9:10 PM PST |
Defendant
MTC Financial, Inc.
MALCOLM CISNEROS, a Law Corporation c/o Kevin Hahn, Esq. 2112 Business Center Drive 2nd Floor
Irvine, CA 92612 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bourne Valley Court Trust
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Renee Johnson
Terminated: 10/28/2013
|
|
Defendant
Nevada Legal News, LLC
Terminated: 04/17/2013
|