Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barbara Ellis-Monro
Case #: 1:12-bk-71188
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Oct 04, 2012
Claims Deadline:Feb 28, 2013
Terminated:Jul 01, 2015

Debtor
Morris Brown College
643 Martin Luther King Jr. Dr., SW
Atlanta, GA 30314
Represented By
Catherine G. Pappas
Dilworth Paxson, LLP
contact info
John A. Moore
The Moore Law Group, LLC
contact info
Anne M. Aaronson
Dilworth Paxson, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Matthew W. Levin
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Clark Atlanta University
Represented By
Suzanne N. Boyd
Alston & Bird, LLP
contact info
David A. Wender
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
J. William Boone
Alston & Bird, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
TR Capital Management, LLC, TR Capital Management, LLC Attention: Terrel Ross PO Box 633 Woodmere, NY 11598
PO BOX 633
Woodmere, NY 11598
Interested Party
Friendship Baptist Church
Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP 999 Peachtree St., NE, Suite 2300
Atlanta, GA 30309
Represented By
Thomas M. Byrne
Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Invest Atlanta
Thompson Hine LLP Two Alliance Ctr., Suite 1600 3560 Lenox Road
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
John F. Isbell
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Garrett A. Nail
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Spring Street, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
David S. Weidenbaum
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Morris Brown College "Victoriously Emerges" From Bankruptcy (newsone.com)
Submitted Mon 03/30/2015
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
531 531 misc Letter Thu 07/21 10:39 AM
Letter by Courtroom Deputy Clerk re: reclaiming of exhibits. (cws)
Related: [-]