Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Charlene Edwards Honeywel
Referred: Mark A Pizzo
Case #: 8:16-cv-01963
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332fd Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 03, 2017 5:07 AM EST
Defendant
Decisioner USA, Inc.
Represented By
Ethan Jerome Loeb
Smolker Bartlett Loeb Hinds & Sheppard, PA
contact info
E. Colin Thompson
Smolker Bartlett Loeb Hinds & Sheppard, PA
contact info
Jon P. Tasso
Smolker Bartlett Loeb Hinds & Sheppard, PA
contact info
Defendant
DecisionHR USA, Inc.
Represented By
Ethan Jerome Loeb
Smolker Bartlett Loeb Hinds & Sheppard, PA
contact info
E. Colin Thompson
Smolker Bartlett Loeb Hinds & Sheppard, PA
contact info
Jon P. Tasso
Smolker Bartlett Loeb Hinds & Sheppard, PA
contact info
Mediator
Peter J. Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, P.A. 3001 W. Azeele St.
Tampa, FL 33609
Represented By
Peter John Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Ideal Frame Company, Inc.
Represented By
William A. Backer
Battaglia, Ross, Dicus & Mcquaid, P.A.
contact info
Timothy D. Swanson
Young, Morphis, Back & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
41 41 order Order dismissing case Tue 07/18 12:30 PM
ORDER dismissing case, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/18/2017. (BGS)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/18 8:34 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/03 2:06 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re17 Amended Complaint,23 Case management and scheduling order filed by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
38 38 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/26 3:50 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Contested Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings and Amend Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an eight (8) page reply on or before May 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/26/2017. (BGS)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 04/26 3:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Contested Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order to Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings and Amend Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff filed an amended motion on March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/26/2017. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
36 36 answer Answer to amended complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Wed 04/05 5:33 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 17 Amended Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ideal Frame Company, Inc., William Lackey, COUNTERCLAIM against Ideal Frame Company, Inc., William Lackey by DecisionHR USA, Inc..(Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
Friday, March 31, 2017
35 35 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/31 4:10 PM
Amended MOTION for leave to file Reply by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of appearance Fri 03/31 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Doucette on behalf of DecisionHR USA, Inc. (Doucette, Allison)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/31 2:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION for leave to file Reply filed by DecisionHR USA, Inc.. (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/31 1:48 PM
MOTION for leave to file Reply by Ideal Frame Company, Inc..(Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 30, 2017
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/30 12:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re17 Amended Complaint,23 Case management and scheduling order filed by DecisionHR USA, Inc.. (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
30 30 adr Mediation report Tue 03/28 1:46 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 28, 2017. Hearing outcome: The parties have reached an impasse .. (Grilli, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
29 29 order Order on motion to dismiss Wed 03/22 11:33 AM
ORDER denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file an Answer to the Amended Complaint within FOURTEEN (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/22/2017. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/20 9:39 AM
ORDER granting 26 Stipulated Motion to Amend Case Management and Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. SEE ORDER FOR NEW SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/20/2017. (BGS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC Mon 03/20 9:42 AM
Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 6/12/2017, Dispositive motions due by 7/10/2017, Pretrial statement due by 10/17/2017, All other motions due by 10/24/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2017 at 3:45 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 12/4/2017 in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/1/2017. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 03/16 9:58 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re17 Amended Complaint,23 Case management and scheduling order by All Plaintiffs.(Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Monday, March 06, 2017
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/06 11:07 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
25 25 notice Notice of appearance Wed 11/02 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Grilli on behalf of Peter J. Grilli (Grilli, Peter)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 11/02 9:16 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Tuesday, March 28, 2017, 10:00 a.m. before Peter J. Grilli. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
23 23 order Case management and scheduling order Tue 09/13 11:23 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/5/2017, Dispositive motions due by 6/9/2017, Pretrial statement due by 9/15/2017, All other motions due by 9/22/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 3:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 11/6/2017 in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/1/2017. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/13/2016. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2016
22 22 misc Case Management Report Fri 09/02 2:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/02 12:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 08/22 3:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by DecisionHR USA, Inc.. (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
19 19 order Order on motion to dismiss Mon 08/08 11:16 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 14 Decisionhr's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, and Supporting Memorandum of Law. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on August 5, 2016, which supersedes the original complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/8/2016. (BGS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2016
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/05 10:51 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/05 10:46 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Decisioner USA, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Ideal Frame Company, Inc..(Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, July 25, 2016
16 16 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Mon 07/25 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Decisioner USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bankers Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Ideal Frame Company, Inc., Other Affiliate DecisionHR USA, Inc. for Decisioner USA, Inc... (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Mon 07/25 10:39 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Decisioner USA, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Mon 07/25 9:06 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Decisioner USA, Inc.. (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Thu 07/21 7:20 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Thu 07/21 7:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested persons order by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Compliance notice Thu 07/21 7:12 AM
NOTICE of compliance by Ideal Frame Company, Inc. (Swanson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion for Hearing Mon 07/18 9:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 motion to attend case management meeting telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 7/18/2016. (CJF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
9 9 motion Hearing Fri 07/15 2:28 PM
MOTION to Appear Telephonically at parties meeting by Ideal Frame Company, Inc. (Backer, William) Modified on 7/15/2016 (RFK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2016
8 8 order Order on motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 07/14 9:02 AM
ORDER granting 5 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 7/14/2016. (CJF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on motion to extend time Thu 07/14 8:52 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to extend time to July 25, 2016, for Defendant to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 7/14/2016. (CJF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
6 6 motion Extend time Tue 07/12 4:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Complaint by Decisioner USA, Inc.. (Loeb, Ethan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 07/12 2:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Timothy Swanson to appear pro hac vice by Ideal Frame Company, Inc.. (Backer, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2016
4 4 order Interested persons order Mon 07/11 4:29 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/25/2016. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/11/2016. (WMD)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Related case order and track 2 notice Mon 07/11 4:28 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 - Breach of Fiduciary Duty. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/25/2016. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/11/2016. (WMD)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Tue 07/12 11:59 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Timothy D. Swanson, appearing on behalf of Ideal Frame Company, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA037784). (AG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2016
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 07/07 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Decisioner USA, Inc. filed by Ideal Frame Company, Inc..(GLS)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 07/07 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 16-003860-CI filed in State Court on 06/10/2016. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA037737 filed by Decisioner USA, Inc.(GLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C