Traxxas, L.P. v. The Firelands Group, LLC
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Referred: | Roy S Payne |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00736 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 07, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 03, 2017 2:33 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
The Firelands Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Traxxas, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Firelands Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
David Folsom
dfolsom@jw.com Jackson Walker, LLP 6002-B Summerfield Drive
Texarkana, TX 75503 |
|
Plaintiff
Traxxas, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 05/03 8:42 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) |
|
40 | 40
order
Judgment
Thu 05/03 8:40 AM
STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/2/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
minutes
Markman Hearing
Thu 07/27 11:09 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 7/27/2017. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, ) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/10 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 7/27/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 04/03 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 7/13/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, ) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/27 1:09 PM
FILED IN ERROR NOTICE by Traxxas, L.P. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Davis, William) Modified on 2/27/2017 (nkl, ) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 02/27 11:44 AM
ORDER granting35 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The Firelands Group, LLC., Cases associated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 02/27 1:33 PM
***FILED IN ERROR - this is consolidated please file in the lead case. Document # 38, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 5:01 PM
NOTICE by The Firelands Group, LLC of Compliance (Hawkins, Christy) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 02/24 10:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by The Firelands Group, LLC.(Doan, Darby) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 01/31 11:36 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/31/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 01/31 10:33 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct31 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by The Firelands Group, LLC.(Hawkins, Christy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 01/30 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Chin on behalf of Traxxas, L.P. (Chin, Edward) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 01/12 8:47 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/11/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 01/11 3:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct26 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, by The Firelands Group, LLC.(Thane, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Protective Order
Wed 11/30 9:26 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/29/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Tue 11/29 6:46 PM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Traxxas, L.P. Under Paragraphs 1 and 3(c) of the Discovery Order (Davis, William) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Protective Order
Tue 11/29 11:05 AM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Protective Order) | ||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Scheduling Order
Mon 11/21 10:17 AM
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re23 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order re16 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Traxxas, L.P.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2017., Jury Selection set for 2/5/2018 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 8/31/2017., Markman Hearing set for 6/30/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 12/18/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/29/2018.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/18/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 11/21 10:14 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER granting24 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order re16 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings filed by Traxxas, L.P... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/18/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 11/18 9:11 AM
Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order re16 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Discovery Order) | ||
23 | 23
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 11/18 9:10 AM
Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order re16 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Docket Control Order) | ||
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Discovery Disclosure
Fri 11/11 1:20 AM
NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Traxxas, L.P. : Plaintiff Traxxas, L.P.'s Notice of Discovery Disclosures Under P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Davis, William) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Referring Case to Mediator
Wed 11/09 9:05 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/8/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Designation of Mediator
Mon 11/07 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable David Folsom, filed by The Firelands Group, LLC. Joint Notice of Mediator (Thane, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 11/03 4:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/16. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml) |
||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 10/24 11:34 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for an Extension of Time to make its P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 10/20 5:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Plaintiff Traxxas, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 10/11 6:41 PM
Plaintiff Traxxas, L.P.'s ANSWER to13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant The Firelands Group, LLC by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/07 10:29 AM
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/06/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
Tue 09/27 8:14 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Traxxas, L.P. (Davis, William) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/16 5:56 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Firelands Group, LLC (Hawkins, Christy) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 09/15 1:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Traxxas, L.P. by The Firelands Group, LLC.(Doan, Darby) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Thu 09/15 2:07 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, ) |
||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/25 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christy Samansky Hawkins on behalf of The Firelands Group, LLC (Hawkins, Christy) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/25 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of The Firelands Group, LLC (Thane, Joshua) |
|
10 | 10
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 08/25 10:47 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Firelands Group, LLC.( Doan, Darby) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 08/25 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darby Vincent Doan on behalf of The Firelands Group, LLC (Doan, Darby) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 08/25 1:02 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Firelands Group, LLC to 9/15/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 07/27 4:50 PM
Defendant The Firelands Group, LLC's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Original Complaint for Patent Infringement (Dkt. 1) re Traxxas, L.P. (Davis, William) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 07/27 5:07 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Firelands Group, LLC to 8/31/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) |
||
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/14 10:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Traxxas, L.P.. The Firelands Group, LLC served on 7/11/2016, answer due 8/1/2016. (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Fri 07/08 2:23 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/08 11:49 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to The Firelands Group, LLC c/o Erwin, Martinkus & Cole Ltd. (nkl, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/08 2:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/08 2:25 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/16. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 07/08 2:26 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 07/07 6:19 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Traxxas, L.P.. (Davis, William) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/07 6:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Traxxas, L.P. (Davis, William) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/07 6:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Coleman on behalf of Traxxas, L.P. (Coleman, Debra) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/07 6:05 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against The Firelands Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5825846.), filed by Traxxas, L.P..(Davis, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,315,040 B2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,982,541 B1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 9,061,763 B1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 9,221,539 B2, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |