TEXO ABC/AGC Inc et al v. Perez et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01998 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 46:1156 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2017 3:16 AM CST |
Defendant
Thomas E Perez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Occupational Safety and Health Administration
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Assis. Sec. of Labor Michaels David
|
|
Defendant
David Michaels
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Secretary of Labor Perez Thomas
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Labor
|
|
Plaintiff
TEXO ABC/AGC Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atlantic Precast Concrete Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Builders and Contractors Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TEXO ABC/AGC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oxford Property Managment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Owen Steel Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Association of Manufacturers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Great American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atlantic Precast Concrete
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Fuel & Petrochemical
|
Represented By
|
![]() Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 8 Emergency MOTION for Injunction and Request for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/28/2016) (epm) |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
71 | 71
![]() Order re:69 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The court is not opposed to the relief sought by the Defendants; however, rather than stay the action, the court will administratively close it. The United States District Clerk is hereby instructed to submit JS-6 form to the Administrative Office. Nothing in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and, should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may file a motion to reopen the case to initiate such further proceedings, or the court may take such action sua sponte. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
70 | 70
![]() MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Michael Hendry Baer-DOJ. Motion filed by Jordan Barab, Edward Hugler, Occupational Safety and Health Administration (Baer-DOJ, Michael) |
|
69 | 69
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by Jordan Barab, Edward Hugler, Occupational Safety and Health Administration with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Baer-DOJ, Michael) |