Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 3:16-cv-00178
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2016
Terminated:Mar 08, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2017 3:29 AM CST
Defendant
Jerrod L Slayton
Attorney at Law 218 West Washington Avenue
Jonesboro, AR 72401
Plaintiff
Grayson Blake
Represented By
Victoria Leigh
Leigh Law PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 08 2017
ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice, with each party bearings its own costs and fees based on 7 joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/8/2017. (jak)
GPO Mar 08 2017
JUDGMENT consistent with 8 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/8/2017. (jak)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
9 9 order Judgment Wed 03/08 3:52 PM
JUDGMENT consistent with8 Order, this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/8/2017. (jak)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Wed 03/08 3:46 PM
ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice, with each party bearings its own costs and fees based on7 joint stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/8/2017. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/06 9:27 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Grayson Blake. (Leigh, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
6 6 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/07 11:59 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial is set for the week of 9/18/2017 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Discovery due by 4/26/2017; Motions due by 7/18/2017; Joinder of Parties due by 4/14/2017; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 8/18/2017 and Jury Instructions are due by 09/08/2017. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 12/07/2016. (plm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2016
5 5 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 10/31 4:00 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Grayson Blake. (Leigh, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
4 4 order Initial Scheduling Order Fri 08/12 3:03 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/18/2016. Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/31/2016. Proposed Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 9/18/2017 09:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/12/16. (bmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/09 11:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grayson Blake. Jerrod L Slayton served on 7/20/2016. (Leigh, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/08 4:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Jerrod L Slayton.(jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/15 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jerrod L Slayton, filed by Grayson Blake. Fee of $ 400 paid. Receipt Number LIT057543. Summons issued.(kdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet