Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:16-bk-33555
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Aug 15, 2016
Claims Deadline:Nov 14, 2016
Terminated:Jan 23, 2018
Plan Confirmed:May 03, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Smile Artist Dentistry PLLC
10065 Almeda Genoa Rd. Suite J
Houston, TX 77075
Represented By
Richard L Fuqua, II
Fuqua & Associates, PC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2016 11:50 AM CDT
Attorney
Richard L Fuqua
5005 Riverway Suite 250
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Richard L Fuqua, II
Fuqua & Associates, PC
contact info
Creditor
Mouataz "Mack" Albukhari
Represented By
George A. Kurisky, Jr.
Johnson Deluca Kurisky & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
City of Houston
Represented By
Owen Mark Sonik
Perdue Brandon Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair
contact info
Creditor
Houston Auto M. Imports Greenway, LTD., d/b/a Mercedes-Benz of Houston Greenway
Represented By
George A. Kurisky, Jr.
Johnson Deluca Kurisky & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, LLC
Represented By
George A. Kurisky, Jr.
Johnson Deluca Kurisky & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
George Quintero
Represented By
George A. Kurisky, Jr.
Johnson Deluca Kurisky & Gould, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
TCF Equipment Finance,a division of TCF National Bank d/b/a OneView Finance
6750 West Loop S. Ste 920
Bellaire, TX 77401
Represented By
Teri H Kelley
Attorney At Law
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Christine A March
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Thursday, January 25, 2018
93 93 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/26 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 37. Notice Date 01/25/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 92 Order on Motion for Final Decree
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
92 92 order Final Decree Tue 01/23 10:39 AM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree Related [+] Signed on 1/23/2018. (adol)
Related: [-] 88
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 01/23 10:40 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (adol)
Related: [-]