Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth A Marra
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:16-cv-81284
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2016
Terminated:Feb 22, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2017 4:10 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Yasir Abdul
Represented By
Jason Ross Marks
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, Pl
contact info
Jorge Roberto Delgado
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levin, P.L.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Inventel, LLC
Represented By
Jason Ross Marks
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, Pl
contact info
Jorge Roberto Delgado
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levin, P.L.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Digital Target Marketing, LLC
Represented By
James Douglas Baldridge
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
Yasir Abdul
Represented By
Jason Ross Marks
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, Pl
contact info
Jorge Roberto Delgado
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levin, P.L.
contact info
Defendant
Inventel, LLC
Represented By
Jason Ross Marks
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levine, Pl
contact info
Jorge Roberto Delgado
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen & Levin, P.L.
contact info
Mediator
John S Freud
Plaintiff
Digital Target Marketing, LLC
Represented By
James Douglas Baldridge
Venable LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
26 26 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/22 10:01 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/21/2017. (ir)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/17 6:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (With Prejudice) by Digital Target Marketing, LLC (Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
24 24 misc Stipulation Wed 01/25 6:05 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation and Order to Substitute Correct Inventel Party by Digital Target Marketing, LLC (Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2016
23 23 adr Notice of Mediator Selection (Optional Hearing) Fri 11/18 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection: John S. Freud selected. Filed/Added by John S Freud. (Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
22 22 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 09/30 3:16 PM
Counter-Defendant's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Digital Target Marketing, LLC. (Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
21 21 order Order Mon 09/26 2:45 PM
ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/26/2016. (pes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
20 20 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Judge Order Referring Case to Mediation Tue 09/20 9:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 3/2/2018 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2016., Discovery due by 9/22/2017., Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2016., Dispositive Motions due by 10/20/2017. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/19/2016. (ir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
19 19 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 09/15 9:15 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Digital Target Marketing, LLC(Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 08, 2016
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 09/08 3:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER Granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Digital Target Marketing, LLC. Answer due 10/3/2016. Re:16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, filed by Yasir Abdul, Inventel, LLC. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 9/8/2016. (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 09/07 7:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Digital Target Marketing, LLC.(Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 19, 2016
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 08/19 5:14 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Yasir Abdul, Inventel, LLC.(Delgado, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 08/16 8:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to1 Complaint, filed by Digital Target Marketing, LLC. Yasir Abdul Answer due 8/19/2016; Inventel, LLC Answer due 8/19/2016. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/16/2016. (ir)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2016
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 08/15 3:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Yasir Abdul, Inventel, LLC.(Delgado, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 12, 2016
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/12 1:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. Response due 8/16/16. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 8/12/2016. (ir)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Fri 08/12 1:20 PM
Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Yasir Abdul response due 8/16/2016; Inventel, LLC response due 8/16/2016. (ir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
12 12 motion Extension of Time Thu 08/11 5:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to the Complaint re1 Complaint, by Yasir Abdul, Inventel, LLC. Attorney Jorge Roberto Delgado added to party Yasir Abdul(pty:dft). Responses due by 8/29/2016(Delgado, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 08/10 6:59 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Digital Target Marketing, LLC. Yasir Abdul served on 7/19/2016, answer due 8/9/2016.(Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 08/10 6:56 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Digital Target Marketing, LLC. Inventel, LLC served on 7/19/2016, answer due 8/9/2016.(Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Tuesday, August 02, 2016
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/02 5:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Inventel, LLC (Delgado, Jorge)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 07/29 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Ross Marks on behalf of Yasir Abdul, Inventel, LLC. Attorney Jason Ross Marks added to party Yasir Abdul(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Ross Marks added to party Inventel, LLC(pty:dft). (Marks, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
7 7 order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 07/19 10:44 AM
Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 7/18/2016. (ir)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/18 1:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Digital Target Marketing, LLC (Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/18 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Yasir Abdul. (srd)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 07/18 10:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Inventel, LLC. (srd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Mon 07/18 10:41 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Mon 07/18 10:40 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra (srd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8920514, filed by Digital Target Marketing, LLC.(Baldridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Inventel, LLC,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Yasir Abdul