California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:16-cv-05421
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2016
Terminated:Apr 17, 2018
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2017 1:19 AM PST
Counter Defendant
Armando Caldera
Represented By
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Defendant
American Medical Collection Agency A.K.A. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.
Defendant
American Medical Collection Agency
Represented By
Sean P Flynn
Gordon And Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
ROES 1 through 10
Plaintiff
Lucy Caldera
Represented By
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Andrei Armas
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Todd M Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Armando Caldera
Represented By
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Andrei Armas
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Lucy Caldera
Represented By
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Todd M Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
American Medical Collection Agency
Represented By
Sean P Flynn
Gordon And Rees LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Claimant
American Medical Collection Agency
Terminated: 01/03/2017
Represented By
Sean P Flynn
Gordon And Rees LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Lucy Caldera
Terminated: 01/03/2017
Represented By
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd Friedman PC
contact info
Todd M Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 18, 2018
46 46 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/18 2:28 PM
ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case45 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties this matter is dismissed with prejudice as to Plaintiff' s individual claims andwithout prejudice as to the putative Class, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
45 45 stip Dismiss Case Thu 05/17 12:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Lucy Caldera.(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
44 44 order Dismissing Case Tue 04/17 3:15 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Case Terminated. IT IS ORDERED that this action be, and hereby is, dismissed in its entirety without prejudice.THE COURT to retain jurisdiction for a period of thirty (30) days to enforce theterms of the settlement. Made JS-6. (ab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/12 4:08 PM
NOTICE of settlement filed by plaintiff Lucy Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
42 42 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 04/11 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective April 17, 2018, Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 590 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 590 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
41 41 attorney Change of Address Mon 06/26 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Todd M Friedman attorney for Plaintiff Lucy Caldera. Changing attorneys address to 21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Filed by Plaintiff Lucy Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
40 40 notice Appearance Mon 03/20 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin Simon Jay on behalf of Defendant American Medical Collection Agency (Attorney Kevin Simon Jay added to party American Medical Collection Agency(pty:dft))(Jay, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
39 39 order Protective Order Wed 02/08 5:35 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiff, Lucina ("Lucy") Caldera (hereinafter referred to as "Plaintiff") and Defendant, Retrieval- Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc., a.k.a. American Medical Collection Agency (hereinafter referred to as "Defendant") through their respective attorneys of record, as follows: WHEREAS, Defendant has served a Third Party Document Subpoena to Total Card Inc. (hereinafter referred to as "TCI") regarding the underlying documents and settlement agreement from a an action involving Plaintiff and TCI. Plaintiff desires to maintain the confidentiality of the subject documents and Defendant has no objection to this request. THEREFORE, it is hereby stipulated, and the parties hereby request, that the Court enter a protective order.38 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr)
Related: [-]
38 38 stip Protective Order Wed 02/08 3:47 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant American Medical Collection Agency.(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
36 36 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/04 8:26 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips:Based on the Notice on withdraw of motions, the Motion to Dismiss21 and the Motion to Strike22 are hereby WITHDRAWN and denied as moot. No appearances are necessary on 01/09/2016. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
37 37 order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 01/04 3:17 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE COUNTERCLAIM; AND ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party34 : IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Withdrawal (Document or Motion) Tue 01/03 12:46 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike,22 , Motion to Dismiss (cause or other),21 filed by Plaintiff Lucy Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
34 34 stip Dismiss Party Thu 12/29 3:34 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss counter defendant Lucy Caldera filed by counter claimant American Medical Collection Agency.(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 04, 2016
33 33 respm Reply (Motion related) Sun 12/04 6:08 PM
REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Cross Complaint Pursuant to CCP § 425.16 Amended Counterclaim15 22 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Lucy Caldera, Plaintiff Lucy Caldera, Counter Defendant Lucy Caldera. (Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply (Motion related) Sun 12/04 5:05 PM
REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross Complaint 21 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Lucy Caldera, Plaintiff Lucy Caldera, Counter Defendant Lucy Caldera. (Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2016
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/28 5:26 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Cross Complaint Pursuant to CCP § 425.16 Amended Counterclaim15 22 filed by Counter Claimant American Medical Collection Agency, Defendant American Medical Collection Agency.(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Flynn Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration Wollman Declaration,
Att: 3 Notice of Manual Filing/Lodging
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/28 5:20 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross Complaint 21 filed by Counter Claimant American Medical Collection Agency, Defendant American Medical Collection Agency. (Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
29 29 order Strike Wed 11/23 1:38 PM
ORDER Denying Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Strike Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Judge Virginia A. Phillips denying23 EX PARTE APPLICATION: To the extent Defendant's application addresses Third Party Armando Caldera's motion to dismiss, the Court finds the application moot, as Armando Caldera withdrew his motion on November 17, 2016. (Doc. No. 26.) Further, the Court finds that although Plaintiff should have met and conferred with Defendant a second time before filing the motions, in the interest of justice, the Court will allow the motions. Accordingly, Defendants application is DENIED. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Tue 11/22 12:26 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re Stipulation to Continue27 : The Stipulation submitted by Plaintiff, Lucy Caldera ("Plaintiff"), and Defendant, American Medical Collection agency a.k.a. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. ("Defendant") is GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Docket no. 21) and Motion to Strike (Docket no. 22) ("Plaintiff's Motions") currently scheduled for December 19, 2016, is continued to January 9, 2017, at 2:00 PM. The current briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motions will remain unchanged. The Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for November 28, 2016, will be reset at the hearing on Plaintiff's Motions. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2016
27 27 stip Continue Mon 11/21 9:22 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike to January 2017 filed by defendant/cross-complainant American Medical Collection Agency.(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 17, 2016
26 26 notice Withdrawal (Document or Motion) Thu 11/17 4:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (cause or other),,20 filed by Cross-Defendant Armando Caldera. (Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 11/17 3:09 PM
OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike motions to dismiss and motion to strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Cross Complaint Pursuant to CCP § 425.16 Amended Counterclaim15 22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross23 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Armando Caldera, Plaintiff Lucy Caldera.(Armas, Andrei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
24 24 notice Appearance Thu 11/17 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrei Armas on behalf of ThirdParty Defendant Armando Caldera, Plaintiff Lucy Caldera (Attorney Andrei Armas added to party Armando Caldera(pty:3pd), Attorney Andrei Armas added to party Lucy Caldera(pty:pla))(Armas, Andrei)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2016
23 23 motion Strike Wed 11/16 4:18 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike motions to dismiss and motion to strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Cross Complaint Pursuant to CCP § 425.16 Amended Counterclaim15 22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross Complaint 21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross Complaint 20 filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant American Medical Collection Agency. (Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
22 22 motion Strike Tue 11/15 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Cross Complaint Pursuant to CCP § 425.16 Amended Counterclaim15 filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Lucy Caldera, Lucy Caldera. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
21 21 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Tue 11/15 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross Complaint filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Lucy Caldera, Lucy Caldera. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Tue 11/15 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Cross Complaint filed by Cross-Defendant Armando Caldera. Motion set for hearing on 12/19/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attorney Adrian Robert Bacon added to party Armando Caldera(pty:cd), Attorney Adrian Robert Bacon added to party Armando Caldera(pty:3pd), Attorney Adrian Robert Bacon added to party Armando Caldera(pty:3pd), Attorney Adrian Robert Bacon added to party Armando Caldera(pty:cd)) (Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 07, 2016
18 18 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 11/07 9:58 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Phillips will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8A on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
19 19 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) Mon 11/07 4:34 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS17 RE: Third Party Complaint; Summons Request16 by Clerk of Court. Document is STRICKEN and shall be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rules of this Court. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
17 17 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Thu 11/03 11:48 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Third Party Complaint; Summons Request16 . The following error(s) was found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: A third party caption should be added to the caption of the attached document. Attachment 1: Request for Issuance of Summons should be e-filed as a separate, stand-alone document, should indicate Third Party Complaint, and have at least one defendant's name and address indicated in the "To:" section. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2016
16 16 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 10/31 5:18 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third Party Defendant Armando Caldera ; Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff American Medical Collection Agency.(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
15 15 othcmp Amended Counterclaim Mon 10/31 4:30 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against counter-defendant Lucy Caldera amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Defendant American Medical Collection Agency(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2016
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 10/06 11:59 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 11/28/2016 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
13 13 order Transfer Pursuant to GO 14-03 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34) Wed 09/28 11:02 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 Related [+] filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:16-cv-00381 CBM(AJWx) (rn)
Related: [-] lated Case
Thursday, September 22, 2016
12 12 notice Related Case(s) Thu 09/22 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant/Counter-Claimant American Medical Collection Agency. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-381 and 2:16-cv-6981 (Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 09/22 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counter-Claimant American Medical Collection Agency, (Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Thu 09/22 3:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Lucy Caldera, Armando Caldera, COUNTERCLAIM against Lucy Caldera, Armando Caldera filed by Defendant/Counter-Claimant American Medical Collection Agency.(Attorney Sean P Flynn added to party American Medical Collection Agency(pty:dft))(Flynn, Sean)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2016
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 07/22 9:58 AM
STANDING ORDER by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (dgon)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 07/22 9:41 AM
STANDING ORDER by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (dgon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/21 4:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Lucy Caldera. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 07/21 4:10 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 07/21 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/20 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lucy Caldera, (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 07/20 5:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lucy Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 07/20 5:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Lucy Caldera. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/20 5:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18220098 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Lucy Caldera. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Lucy Caldera(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]