Wang et al v. Cool Technologies, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roslynn R Mauskopf |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-04101 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 21, 2017 5:14 AM EST |
Defendant
Cool Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Brian Duffy
|
|
Defendant
Timothy Hassett
|
|
Plaintiff
Zhi-Feng Cai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sze Ping Chang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Chang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kam-Chow Chong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lin Chi Chu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanley Hok Koo Kam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Sze Kong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fai Lam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lin-Xin Li
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jimmy Shao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yeung None Wang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/09 1:21 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, that the above-captioned action hereby is and shall be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), and without costs to either. So Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 7/3/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order Dismissing Parties
Mon 07/09 11:14 AM
Order Dismissing Parties: Per document37 Defendant Brian Duffy is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 7/9/2018. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/05 5:35 PM
Letter MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Unrepresented Defendant, Brian Duffy by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang. (Sim, Sang) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Thu 07/05 5:31 PM
Letter to Judge Kuo by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang (Sim, Sang) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 07/03 3:20 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to notify the Court by July 10, 2018 via ECF, whether they intend to dismiss the case against unrepresented defendant Brian Duffy, or if not, indicate what their proposed next steps are. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/3/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/02 7:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang (Sim, Sang) |
|
34 | 34
9
pgs
misc
Settlement Agreement
Mon 07/02 6:18 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang (Sim, Sang) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 06/01 9:55 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Adjourn Conference. In light of the letter filed at33 , the conference scheduled for June 4, 2018 is adjourned sine die . The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by July 2, 2018 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/1/2018. (Moon, Linda) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Settlement 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 06/01 10:40 AM
ORDER terminating33 Motion for Settlement as incorrectly filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/1/2018. (Moon, Linda) |
||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
motion
Settlement Adjourn Conference
Thu 05/31 6:43 PM
Letter MOTION for Settlement , Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for Monday, June 4, 2018 by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang. (Sim, Sang) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 05/30 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Status Conference set for June 4, 2018 is rescheduled from 11:00 am to 10:00 am in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/30/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/30 4:19 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for Friday, May 4, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Peggy Kuo by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang. (Sim, Sang) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/30 5:59 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The status conference set for May 4, 2018 is rescheduled to June 4, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/30/2018. (Moon, Linda) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Mon 04/09 6:47 PM
NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Affiliation by Sang Sim (Sim, Sang) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 04/04 2:26 PM
ORDER: The Court notes that counsel address listed on the Notice of Appearance filed at30 and the one listed on the docket sheet are different. He is directed to file a Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email via ECF, to reflect his updated information. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/4/2018. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice(Other)
Tue 04/03 6:26 PM
NOTICE by Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang of Entry of Order dated April 3, 2018 (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/03 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sang Joon Sim on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Sim, Sang) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Tue 04/03 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Sang Joon Sim (Sim, Sang) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/03 3:13 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kenneth K. Ho, Esq., attorney for by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang. (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Consent to Change Attorney | ||
order
1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/03 4:35 PM
ORDER: The Status Conference set for April 4, 2018 is adjourned until May 4, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Plaintiffs' new counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance immediately. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/3/2018. (Moon, Linda) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/03 6:11 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kenneth Kangmin Ho is terminated from this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/3/2018. (Moon, Linda) |
||
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/02 11:18 AM
ORDER denying25 ,26 Motions to Adjourn Conference. The Court will adjourn the conference set for April 4, 2018, if counsel for Plaintiffs file his motion to withdraw as counsel before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/2/2018. (Moon, Linda) |
||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 03/29 12:46 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on April 4th, 2018 before Hon. Peggy Kuo, Magistrate Judge by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang. (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 03/28 3:27 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Subpoena
Tue 03/27 7:52 PM
Subpoena by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/14 11:48 AM
ORDER: Status Conference set for April 4, 2018 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C South before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. The Court will not permit any attorney who has not filed a notice of appearance to appear in this action. (Moon, Linda) |
||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 03/06 4:50 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 03/06 5:13 PM
ORDER: From the parties' submissions, it appears that there are likely disputes of fact with regard to defendants' proposed motion to dismiss on jurisdictional grounds as well as an ostensible 12(b)(6) motion directed at the fraud and breach of contract claims. Discovery may be warranted on the jurisdictional issues, and the other grounds for defendants motion may call for resolution on summary judgment after discovery. As such, the Court orders the parties to appear before the assigned Magistrate Judge to address all issues related to defendant's proposed motion, including discovery. Should a defense motion move forward, it is hereby referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a Report and Recommendation as appropriate. In light of this Order, the conference scheduled for Friday, March 9 is adjourned sine die . Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 3/6/2018. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Thu 03/01 11:59 PM
Letter pursuant to the Order of the Court dated 2/22/2018 by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Thu 02/22 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf: Pre Motion Conference held on 2/22/2018: Yangtin Guo for plaintiffs; Steven Feldman for defendants Hassett and Cool Technologies. Ms. Guo, who has not entered an appearance in this action, was unable to address the issues raised on this pre-motion conference, including such basic issues as whether Mr. Duffy is a defendant in this action. As a result, the Court hereby ORDERS Kenneth Ho and Steven Feldman, counsel of record, to appear at a pre-motion conference at 3:30 pm on Friday March 9. In addition, by Thursday, March 1, 2018, Mr. Ho is ORDERED to file a supplemental response to both of defendants' submissions, one filed on 8/7/2017 (Doc. No.15 ) and the second filed on 2/18/2018 (Doc. No.21 ), specifically addressing the factual issues raised therein and setting forth the legal bases, with case citations, that plaintiffs intend to rely on in opposition to the proposed motion. As stated in Court today, the Court will not permit any attorney who has not filed a notice of appearance to appear in this action. (Court Reporter Sophie Nolan.) (Mauskopf, Roslynn) |
||
Sunday, February 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Reply in Opposition
Sun 02/18 9:28 PM
REPLY in Opposition re18 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Exhibit B | ||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 01/22 11:51 AM
ORDER: The defendants' motion, on consent, to adjourn conference20 is granted. The Pre-Motion Conference previously scheduled for 1/25/2018 at 11:30 AM is now adjourned to 2/22/2018 at 10:30 AM. Counsel for all parties must attend. The conference will take place before Judge Mauskopf in Courtroom 6A on the 6th floor of the South Wing, United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel shall confer to ensure that all parties are aware of the date and time of the conference. Counsel shall arrive 15 minutes before the docket call and check in with the courtroom deputy. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/22/2018. (Zhu, Angela) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 01/18 3:45 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 01/16 9:30 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. The Court will hold a Pre-Motion Conference on 1/25/2018 at 11:30 AM. Counsel for all parties must attend. The conference will take place before Judge Mauskopf in Courtroom 6A on the 6th floor of the South Wing, United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel shall confer to ensure that all parties are aware of the date and time of the conference. Counsel shall arrive 15 minutes before the docket call and check in with the courtroom deputy. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/16/2018. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/04 10:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang re18 Response to Order to Show Cause ON DEFENDANTS (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 01/04 10:44 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 01/04 9:39 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Thu 12/21 4:26 PM
DECLARATION of Service by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 12/14 4:24 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The plaintiffs are hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 4, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, failure to comply with Court orders pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 41(b), and/or for the reasons set forth in the defendants' proposed motion to dismiss this case. If the plaintiffs fail to show cause in writing by January 4, 2018, the Court is likely to dismiss this action. The defendants shall serve the plaintiffs with a copy of this order and file a declaration of service by December 21, 2017. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/14/2017. |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 10/10 12:41 PM
ORDER: By October 17, 2017, the plaintiffs shall file a letter with the Court, not to exceed three pages, setting forth the legal and factual bases on which they intend to oppose the defendants' proposed motion to dismiss (15 ). Upon receipt of this filing, the Court will further advise the parties as to whether a pre-motion conference is required. The defendants' time to answer is extended until 21 days after this Court's order on any motion to dismiss, or until further order of the Court. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 10/10/2017. |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 08/07 12:44 PM
Second MOTION for pre motion conference re13 Amended Complaint, Initial Conference Hearing,,,, Set Deadlines,,,1 Complaint, Order by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett. (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice(Other)
Sat 07/01 11:59 AM
NOTICE by Yeung None Wang re13 Amended Complaint Certificate of Service (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/30 7:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by Yeung None Wang. (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Subscription Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Schedule A, Shares of Plaintiffs | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 05/25 6:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Initial Conference held on 5/25/2017. Attorney Wangting Guo appeared on behalf of plaintiffs. Attorney Steven Feldman appeared on behalf of defendants. Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint that addresses alleged deficiencies in the Complaint, no later than June 30, 2017. The parties were directed to exchange discovery that focuses on diversity and venue. The Court granted defendants' request to direct plaintiff Gary Sze Kong to preserve all computer and other records which may still be at the Law Offices of Gary Park. Defendants were granted leave to subpoena such records if they are no longer under the control of Plaintiff Kong. (Tape #10:36-11:11.) (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 05/24 4:21 PM
ORDER: In anticipation of the Initial Conference scheduled for May 25, 2017, the parties should be prepared to discuss Defendants' proposed Motion to Dismiss, in addition to a discovery schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 5/24/2017. (Feldman, Shira) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/23 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Feldman on behalf of Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett (aty to be noticed) (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/14 11:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on May 25, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to make sure that all necessary parties are aware of the conference. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. Counsel are required to bring to the conference a completed copy of the attached Rule 26(f) Conference Checklist, and to file before the conference a completed copy of the attached proposed Initial Scheduling Order, a pdf-fillable version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-schedo.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/14/2017 (Riquelme, Claudia) |
|
Att: 1 Initial Scheduling Order Form, | ||
Att: 2 Conference Checklist | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 04/13 8:43 AM
ORDER: Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference10 is denied with leave to renew after an initial conference before Magistrate Judge Kuo. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 4/13/2017. |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Thu 03/30 5:36 PM
Letter requesting pre-motion conference by Cool Technologies, Inc., Timothy Hassett (Feldman, Steven) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/09 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yeung None Wang (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/01 12:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yeung None Wang. Cool Technologies, Inc. served on 11/18/2016, answer due 12/9/2016. (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Mon 11/28 12:42 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed 11/18/2016 Acknowledgement filed by Yeung None Wang. (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 11/30 8:51 AM
Incorrect Entry Information: Document7 was filed using the wrong Event, Counsel should re-file document7 using the Event "Summons Returned Executed". (Manson, Eddie) |
||
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Tue 09/06 2:07 PM
5 Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Approved by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 9/6/2016. (Marziliano, August) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Tue 09/06 2:03 PM
MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Zhi-Feng Cai, Sze Ping Chang, Tommy Chang, Kam-Chow Chong, Lin Chi Chu, Stanley Hok Koo Kam, Gary Sze Kong, Fai Lam, Lin-Xin Li, Jimmy Shao, Yeung None Wang. (Marziliano, August) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 08/03 8:49 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/28 1:00 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/29 9:25 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/29 9:24 AM
Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Wed 07/27 11:04 AM
NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (missing second page). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. A completed Civil Cover Sheet can be found under the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/25 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT Yeung Wang against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8783187 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Gary Sze Kong. (Ho, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/25 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8782980 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Gary Sze Kong. (Ho, Kenneth) |