Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03176
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2016
Terminated:Jun 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc. dba Verizon
Represented By
Verizon Communications, Inc. dba Verizon
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Monday, June 26, 2017
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Mon 06/26 10:13 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 06/23 3:21 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between Verizon Communications, Inc. dba Verizon filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
5 5 answer None Wed 10/26 10:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson Leonard Street LLP on behalf of Verizon Communications Inc.. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, July 28, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/28 12:18 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 07/26 1:09 PM
Summons and notice issued to Verizon Communications, Inc. dba Verizon Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, July 25, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 07/25 5:42 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03176 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24457273, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 07/25 3:54 PM
Adversary case 16-03176 Complaint against Verizon Communications, Inc. dba Verizon filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet