Shade Trees & Evergreens, Inc.
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:16-bk-20025 |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 26, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Debtor
Shade Trees & Evergreens, Inc.
11101 Liberty Rd
Frederick, MD 21701-2655 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Janet M. Nesse
McNamee, Hosea, et.al. 6411 Ivy Lane Suite 200
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Roger Schlossberg
18421 Henson Boulevard Suite 201
Hagerstown, MD 21742 |
Docket last updated: 07/27/2016 5:02 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Janet M. Nesse, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/12/2016 at 10:30 AM at Meeting Room A,Springhill Suites by Marriott,17280 Valley Mall Rd. | ||
1 | 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Shade Trees & Evergreens, Inc.. (Hare, Constance) | |
2 | 2 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Constance M. Hare. (Hare, Constance) | |
3 | 3 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-20025 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 29022875. Fee amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) | |
4 | 4 Line filing Corporate Resolution on behalf of Shade Trees & Evergreens, Inc. Filed by Constance M. Hare. (Hare, Constance) |