Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-11724

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-bk-11727
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2016
Terminated:Dec 30, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The 7711 Corporation
1000 Louisiana St Ste 6700
Houston, TX 77002-6003
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Friday, December 30, 2016
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 12/30 9:02 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
5 5 order Final Decree Thu 12/29 3:09 PM
Final Decree and Order Closing the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating the Services of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent in the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 12/29/2016 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 07/29 12:26 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Halcon Resources Corporation 16-11724 BLS); Halcon Holdings, Inc. 16-11725 BLS); HK Resources, LLC 16-11726 BLS); The 7711 Corporation 16-11727 BLS); Halcon Gulf States, LLC 16-11728 BLS); Halcon Louisiana Operating, L.P. 16-11729 BLS); Halcon Field Services, LLC 16-11730 BLS); Halcon Energy Properties, Inc. 16-11731 BLS); Halcon Operating Co., Inc. 16-11732 BLS); Halcon Williston I, LLC 16-11733 BLS); Halcon Williston II, LLC 16-11734 BLS); Halcon Resources Operating, Inc. 16-11735 BLS); HRC Energy Louisiana, LLC 16-11736 BLS); HRC Energy Resources (WV), Inc. 16-11737 BLS); HRC Production Company 16-11738 BLS); Halcon Energy Holdings, LLC 16-11739 BLS); HRC Energy, LLC 16-11740 BLS); HK Energy, LLC 16-11741 BLS); HK Louisiana Operating, LLC 16-11742 BLS); HK Oil & Gas, LLC 16-11743 BLS); HK Energy Operating, LLC 16-11744 BLS); HRC Operating, LLC 16-11745 BLS). The docket in Case No. 16-11724 BLS should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] Order Signed on 7/29/2016. (MDW)
Related: [-] 3
Thursday, July 28, 2016
3 3 court Case Reassigned Thu 07/28 8:27 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 07/28 8:11 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 07/27 9:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11727 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8107591, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 07/27 6:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by The 7711 Corporation. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]