New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Arthur D Spatt
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:16-cv-04158
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2016
Terminated:Oct 01, 2018
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2017 4:39 AM EST
Defendant
G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC
Represented By
Kyle T Pulis
Scott Michael Mishkin PC
contact info
Defendant
G.M. O'Shea Properties, LLC
Represented By
Kyle T Pulis
Scott Michael Mishkin PC
contact info
Defendant
Gerald M O'Shea, Inc
Defendant
L.I. Hardware
Represented By
Kyle T Pulis
Scott Michael Mishkin PC
contact info
Defendant
Gerald M. O'Shea
Represented By
Kyle T Pulis
Scott Michael Mishkin PC
contact info
Defendant
Gerald M O'Shea, Inc.
Represented By
Kyle T Pulis
Scott Michael Mishkin PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Florentin A. Saravia
Represented By
Steven John Moser
Steven J. Moser
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, October 01, 2018
23 23 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/02 10:54 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re22 status report advising of settlement. Case closed subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 10/1/18. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 10/01 12:02 PM
ORDER re22 : The parties' have reported that the case is settled. Accordingly, the final conference scheduled for October 29, 2018 is canceled. The parties are directed to submit the final settlement documents to the District Judge on or before November 1, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/1/2018. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 28, 2018
22 22 misc Status Report Fri 09/28 3:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Advising of Settlement by Florentin A. Saravia (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 06/27 11:23 AM
ORDER re21 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, is to be completed by September 28, 2018. The deadline to commence dispositive motion practice is extended to October 12, 2018. The final conference scheduled for July 25, 2018 is adjourned to October 29, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to electronically file a proposed joint pretrial order, in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. The Court notes that this is the fourth request to extend the discovery schedule. No further adjournments will be provided absent extraordinary circumstances. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/27/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 06/25 10:34 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to 9/28/2018 by Florentin A. Saravia. (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/27 11:36 AM
ORDER re20 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, is to be completed by June 27, 2018. The deadline to commence dispositive motion practice is extended to July 11, 2018. The final conference scheduled for May 1, 2018 is adjourned to July 25, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. The parties are directed to electronically file a proposed joint pretrial order, in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 3/27/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/26 12:25 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC, G.M. O'Shea Properties, LLC, Gerald M O'Shea, Inc., L.I. Hardware, Gerald M. O'Shea. (Pulis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 12/28 9:54 AM
ORDER re19 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, is to be completed by March 29, 2018. The deadline to commence dispositive motion practice is extended to April 12, 2018. The final conference scheduled for January 30, 2018 is adjourned to May 1, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. The parties are directed to electronically file a proposed joint pretrial order, in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/28/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/27 2:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Florentin A. Saravia. (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/02 11:24 AM
ORDER re18 : The scheduling order is modified as follows: All discovery, inclusive of expert discovery, is to be completed by December 29, 2017. The deadline to commence dispositive motion practice is extended to January 12, 2018. The final conference scheduled for October 31, 2017 is adjourned to January 30, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to electronically file a proposed joint pretrial order, in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/2/2017. (Lanin, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2017
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/29 11:29 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Florentin A. Saravia. (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
17 17 notice Notice(Other) Wed 09/27 5:13 PM
NOTICE by Florentin A. Saravia of change of firm name (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/19 3:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for October 31, 2017 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/19/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Thu 01/19 3:07 PM
ORDER re15 : The request to alter the dates set forth in the proposed scheduling order is granted, in part. The undersigned will not micro-manage the course of discovery, and it is left to the parties to determine any intermediate discovery deadlines. In addition, the undersigned does not schedule discovery status conferences. The parties may request a discovery conference at any time, should the need arise. Accordingly, the initial conference is canceled. The scheduling order will be entered by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/19/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
15 15 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 01/18 2:22 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Florentin A. Saravia (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
order Order(Other) Tue 01/17 10:55 AM
ORDER: The January 18, 2017 Initial Conference is adjourned to January 25, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to review the Court's December 28, 2016 Order and Proposed Scheduling Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/17/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2016
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email Fri 12/30 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Steven John Moser (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/28 12:31 PM
Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/28/2016. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/04 9:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC, G.M. O'Shea Properties, LLC, Gerald M O'Shea, Inc., L.I. Hardware, Gerald M. O'Shea (Pulis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/04 9:39 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, by All Defendants. (Pulis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2016
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 08/18 1:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Florentin A. Saravia. G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC waiver sent on 8/5/2016, answer due 10/4/2016; G.M. O'Shea Properties, LLC waiver sent on 8/5/2016, answer due 10/4/2016; Gerald M O'Shea, Inc. waiver sent on 8/5/2016, answer due 10/4/2016; L.I. Hardware waiver sent on 8/5/2016, answer due 10/4/2016; Gerald M. O'Shea waiver sent on 8/5/2016, answer due 10/4/2016. (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GM O'Shea Properties Management Executed waiver of service,
Att: 2 Gerald M O'shea Inc. Executed waiver of service,
Att: 3 Gerald M O'shea Executed waiver of service,
Att: 4 L.I. Hardware Executed waiver of service
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/09 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T Pulis on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Pulis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 1:53 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerald M. O'Shea. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 1:49 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gerald M O'Shea, Inc.. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 1:47 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to G.M. O'Shea Properties, LLC. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 1:45 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 1:44 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to L.I. Hardware. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 07/28 10:03 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 07/28 9:59 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/28 10:03 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/27 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT against G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC, G.M. O'Shea Properties, LLC, Gerald M O'Shea, Inc, L.I. Hardware, Gerald M. O'Shea filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-8790947, filed by Florentin A. Saravia. (Moser, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons for G.M.O'Shea Properties, LLC,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons for G.M. O'Shea Properties Management, LLC,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons for L.I.Hardware,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons for Gerald M O'Shea, Inc,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons for Gerald M O'Shea