Original Case: 2:15-cv-04680

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-56063
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2016
Terminated:Oct 30, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 01, 2017 1:40 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
CVS PHARMACY, doing business as Garfield Beach CVS LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Lenkov
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Robert P. Wargo
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN DOE 1
Defendant - Appellee
JANE DOE 1
Defendant - Appellee
JANE DOE 2
Defendant - Appellee
JANE DOE 3
Defendant - Appellee
CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Lenkov
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CVS RX SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Lenkov
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM NGO
Defendant - Appellee
NATALIE VALERRAMA
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Lenkov
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Robert P. Wargo
Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RICHARD HERBERT
Represented By
Richard Herbert
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/01/2017 1:35 AM PDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE AND APPELLANT IN PRO SE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 08/24/2016. Transcript due 11/22/2016. Appellant Richard Herbert opening brief due 01/03/2017. Appellees CVS Pharmacy, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 1, William Ngo and Natalie Valerrama answering brief due 01/31/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10064143] (DJW) [Entered: 07/26/2016 03:36 PM]
Related: [-]