Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03223
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2016
Terminated:Mar 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sekisui Diagnostics, LLC
Represented By
Sekisui Diagnostics, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 03/14 9:33 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 03/10 11:08 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/29 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order
Thursday, July 28, 2016
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 07/28 10:27 AM
Summons and notice issued to Sekisui Diagnostics, LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 07/27 3:28 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03223 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24470688, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 07/27 2:40 PM
Adversary case 16-03223 Complaint against Sekisui Diagnostics, LLC filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1