Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03227
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2016
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
MD Logic, Inc.
Represented By
MD Logic, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, February 03, 2017
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 02/03 9:14 AM
Affidavit of Service of Affidavit of American Legal Claims Services, LLC Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Stipulation filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 01/31 9:03 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 01/30 2:43 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between MD Logic, Inc., filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
5 5 answer None Tue 11/29 3:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Jorge A. Ortiz of Jorge A. Ortiz, PLLC on behalf of MD Logic, Inc.. (Ortiz, Jorge)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 29, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/29 1:55 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order
Thursday, July 28, 2016
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 07/28 10:36 AM
Summons and notice issued to MD Logic, Inc. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 07/27 3:28 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03227 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24470688, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 07/27 2:50 PM
Adversary case 16-03227 Complaint against MD Logic, Inc. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1