Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03233
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2016
Terminated:Feb 15, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neopost USA, Inc. dba Hasler
Represented By
Neopost USA, Inc. dba Hasler
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 02/15 8:25 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 02/14 2:11 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/29 2:09 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order
Thursday, July 28, 2016
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 07/28 10:44 AM
Summons and notice issued to Neopost USA, Inc. dba Hasler Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 07/27 3:28 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03233 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24470688, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 07/27 3:24 PM
Adversary case 16-03233 Complaint against Neopost USA, Inc. dba Hasler filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1