Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Joe Heaton
Case #: 5:16-cv-00862
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2016
Terminated:Oct 12, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2017 3:17 AM CST
Defendant
Yukon Police Department, The
Represented By
Ambre C Gooch
Collins Zorn & Wagner PC
contact info
Michael D Segler
Wheatley Segler Osby & Miller LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Trudy Patterson
Represented By
Jeffery A Taylor
Chadwick & Taylor
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 28, 2016
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/28 2:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Yukon Police Department, The. (Gooch, Ambre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
12 12 order Administrative Closing Order Wed 10/12 5:28 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/12/2016. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/04 4:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions in limine due 6/15/2017; Jury instructions due 6/15/2017; Voir dire requests due 6/15/2017; Trial briefs due 6/15/2017; Discovery due by 4/1/2017. Jury Trial set on the court's 07/2017 trial docket in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Motions due by 4/15/2017. Pretrial Report due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/4/2016. (cla)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Tue 10/04 4:43 PM
ORDER striking the 10/05/2016 scheduling conference...see separate scheduling order for trial setting and deadlines. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/4/2016.(cla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Guidelines for Confidentiality Orders
Monday, September 26, 2016
9 9 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Mon 09/26 12:11 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Trudy Patterson. (Taylor, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
8 8 misc Docket Thu 09/01 2:45 PM
CIVIL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/05/2016 @ 10:20 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Joe Heaton. Status Report due by 09/26/2016. (cla)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
7 7 notice ~Notice (other) Fri 08/12 12:18 PM
NOTICE (other) by Yukon Police Department, The Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Gooch, Ambre)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Fri 08/12 12:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Yukon Police Department, The.(Gooch, Ambre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 08/10 3:20 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D Segler on behalf of All Defendants (Segler, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 08/09 2:55 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ambre C Gooch on behalf of Yukon Police Department, The (Gooch, Ambre)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 07/28 12:56 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffery A Taylor on behalf of Trudy Patterson (Taylor, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 12:01 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Yukon Police Department, The. (cla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/28 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Yukon Police Department, The filed by Trudy Patterson.(cla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Thu 07/28 12:47 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2327900. (Taylor, Jeffery)
Related: [-]