Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Terry R Means
Case #: 4:16-cv-00706
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2016
Re-opened:Feb 18, 2020
Terminated:Apr 23, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2017 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
Conn Appliances, Inc.
Defendant
Conn Appliances Inc
Represented By
Michael Allen Harvey
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr
contact info
Plaintiff
Matt Larson
Represented By
Jenny Diane DeFrancisco
Lemberg Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 23, 2020
38 38 order Judgment Thu 04/23 1:21 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, the decision of the arbitrator is CONFIRMED. Matt Larson shall have and recover from Conn Appliances, Inc. damages in the amount of $373,500, with post-judgment interest to accrue, as awarded by the arbitrator, in the amount of five percent per annum from June 14, 2019, until paid. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 shall be borne by Conn Appliances, Inc. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/23/2020) (npk)
Related: [-]
37 37 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/23 1:17 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Confirm theArbitration Award; denying30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/23/2020) (npk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2019
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/25 7:53 AM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re:29 MOTION to Reopen Case and Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Conn Appliances Inc (Knight, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
35 35 respm Reply Fri 07/12 4:40 PM
REPLY filed by Conn Appliances Inc re:30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Knight, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
34 34 respm Reply Fri 06/28 5:11 PM
REPLY filed by Matt Larson re:29 MOTION to Reopen Case and Confirm Arbitration Award (Burton, Jody)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/25 4:30 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Before the Court is an unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of a motion to reopen this case and confirm an arbitration award by plaintiff Matt Larson (doc.32 ). After review, the Court GRANTS the motion. Larson shall have until 11:59 p.m. on June 28, 2019, to file his reply. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/25/2019) (tln)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2019
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/21 3:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to29 MOTION to Reopen Case and Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Matt Larson (Burton, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
31 31 respm Appendix in Support Tue 06/11 7:54 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Conn Appliances Inc re30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Knight, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
30 30 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 06/11 7:51 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Conn Appliances Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Nolan Knight added to party Conn Appliances Inc(pty:dft) (Knight, Nolan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
29 29 motion Reopen Case Tue 05/21 5:39 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case and Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Matt Larson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Burton, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Retail Installment Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Ruling on Summary Judgment and Arbitration Award
28 28 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/21 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jody Berke Burton on behalf of Matt Larson. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Burton, Jody)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util Super U Wed 04/11 1:48 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO ARBITRATION: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation to Arbitration (doc.26 ). Case is compelled to arbitration and the action in this Court is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending the completion of arbitration. The case may be reopened, without prejudice, upon the motion of either party filed no later than thirty days after the arbitrator issues a final decision. Case stayed. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/11/2018) (npk)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Public Entry) Wed 04/11 1:51 PM
Civil Case Terminated per #27 . (npk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
26 26 misc Stipulation Fri 03/23 9:44 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Arbitration by Conn Appliances Inc. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 26, 2018
25 25 motion Protective Order Mon 02/26 9:34 AM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Conn Appliances Inc (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 30, 2017
24 24 respm Reply Thu 11/30 9:41 AM
REPLY filed by Conn Appliances Inc re:20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
23 23 respm Response/Objection Thu 11/16 1:07 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Matt Larson re:20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 11/08 12:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES granting21 Motion to Continue. Discovery due by 2/27/2018. Motions due by 4/3/2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 11/8/2017) (npk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
21 21 motion Continue Mon 10/30 1:47 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue discovery and dispositive motion deadlines filed by Matt Larson (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 26, 2017
20 20 motion Stay Thu 10/26 1:05 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Conn Appliances Inc (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, August 14, 2017
19 19 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 08/14 2:39 PM
ORDER GRANTING17 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES: The deadline for completing all discovery in this cause is EXTENDED until 10/30/2017; and the deadline for filing all pretrial and dispositive motions is EXTENDED until 12/4/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/14/2017) (bdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
18 18 adr ADR Summary Thu 07/27 11:51 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Matt Larson. Attorneys in Attendance: Jenny DeFrancisco and Chris Jordan. Prv Fee: $ 1,800.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
17 17 motion Continue Wed 07/26 7:20 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue discovery and dispositive motion deadlines filed by Matt Larson (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
16 16 trial Designation of Experts Tue 05/30 6:24 PM
Designation of Experts by Conn Appliances Inc. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
15 15 order Order For ADR Tue 05/02 4:04 PM
ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. The court appoints Robert C Jenevein as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation during the month of July. ADR Summary provided as Exhibit B to the order. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. ADR Summary form due 8/7/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/2/2017) (npk) [ADR docs emailed to provider] Modified on 5/2/2017 (npk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
14 14 adr Designation of Mediator Fri 04/28 10:48 AM
Designation of Mediator by Conn Appliances Inc. (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 03/16 9:46 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw..Alyssa M. Pazandak withdrawn as cnsl; Jackie Wheeler substituted as counsel for Defendant. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/16/2017) (wrb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
12 12 motion Withdraw Fri 03/10 3:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Alyssa M. Pazandak filed by Conn Appliances Inc (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
11 11 order Order For ADR Wed 01/25 2:01 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION IN JULY 2017. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. The parties are to complete mediation during the month of July. ADR Summary provided as Exhibit B to the order. Deadline for parties to designate a mediator is on or before 5/1/2017. ADR Summary form due 8/7/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/25/2017) (npk)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/25 1:59 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2017. Discovery due by 7/31/2017. Motions due by 8/31/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/25/2017) (npk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
9 9 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Tue 11/15 2:46 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Matt Larson. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
8 8 order Status Report Order Thu 10/20 3:43 PM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/20/2016) (npk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2016
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/14 2:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Conn Appliances, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael Allen Harvey added to party Conn Appliances, Inc.(pty:dft) (Harvey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/17 9:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Conn Appliances, Inc.. Waiver sent on 8/15/2016. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Conn Appliances, Inc.. (npk)
Related: [-]
4 4 qcref Means Thu 07/28 3:23 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 07/28 1:17 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Matt Larson. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 07/28 1:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Matt Larson. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/28 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Conn Appliances, Inc. filed by Matt Larson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7758978) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (DeFrancisco, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet