California Central District Court
Judge:Terry J Hatter, Jr
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:16-cv-05644
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2016
Terminated:Apr 30, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2017 1:29 AM PST
Defendant
Zee Law Group
Plaintiff
Khalid Zubair
Represented By
Joshua B Swigart
Hyde And Swigart
contact info
Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info
Mona Amini
Kazerouni Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 30, 2018
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/30 1:53 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Case39 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
39 39 stip Dismiss Case Wed 04/25 3:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair.(Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 08, 2018
38 38 notice Settlement Thu 03/08 11:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
37 37 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 11/03 2:10 PM
ORDER Setting Final Pre-trial Conference and Referring Discovery by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. It is Ordered, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and Local Rule 16, that the Final Pre-Trial Conference is placed on the Court's calendar for JUNE 18, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 9B in the U. S. Courthouse on First Street. It is Ordered that all discovery matters which become at issue are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for his/her consideration. See document for details. (smo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
36 36 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10/17 2:13 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition19 filed by Defendant Zee Law Group.(Bao, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 10/17 1:59 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Collect Access, LLC (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
34 34 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 10/16 6:26 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Collect Access, LLC filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 5 Proof of Service
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
33 33 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 10/04 8:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair, upon Defendant Collect Access, LLC served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
32 32 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/03 5:13 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause, if any, as to why Defendant Collect Access LLC, should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to serve Collect Access, LLC within the time limits imposed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Plaintiff shall file a written response to this Order to Show Cause by October 30, 2017. Any brief in opposition to Plaintiffs written response shall be filed no later thanseven days after Plaintiffs response is filed. Plaintiff may file a rely brief to any opposition no later than seven days after any opposition brief is filed. (shb)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Dismiss Dismiss Case Tue 10/03 1:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: IT IS ORDERED that that the motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED only to the extent that the claim is based on a violation of 15 U.S.C. § 1692e(11). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, Denied to the extent that the claim is based on a violation of 15 U.S.C. §§ 1692f(1), 1692e(2)(B) and 1692e(5). (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
30 30 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 06/27 3:41 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 Defendant Zee Law Group's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Bao, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
29 29 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 06/26 5:13 PM
OBJECTION in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 in Opposition to Defendant's Reply filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 06/26 2:33 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Bao, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/19 12:46 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
26 26 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 05/30 2:37 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Tran, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
25 25 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 05/26 4:18 PM
OBJECTION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 24 filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2017
24 24 motion Dismiss Case Thu 05/25 10:29 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Bao, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
23 23 service Summons Issued Fri 05/12 10:18 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition19 as to Defendant Collect Access, LLC. (shb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
22 22 notice Summons Request Thu 05/11 5:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties21 , Amended Complaint/Petition19 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)20 filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 05/11 5:36 PM
Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair, identifying Zee Law Group and Collect Access, LLC. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 05/11 5:34 PM
AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
19 19 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 05/11 5:31 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Zee Law Group, Collect Access, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair(Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
18 18 respm Motion Related Document Wed 04/26 5:26 PM
DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO MOTION TO DISMISS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 13 filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Tran, Cindy)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Amendment (Motion related) Wed 04/26 4:51 PM
Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 13 Amended Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Tran, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
16 16 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Tue 04/25 12:23 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 13 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 04/25 11:31 AM
Objection re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 13 filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2017
14 14 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 04/24 8:22 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 13 filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Tran, Cindy)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Mon 04/24 8:20 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Zee Law Group. (Attorney Cindy N Tran added to party Zee Law Group(pty:dft)) (Tran, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 17, 2017
12 12 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Mon 04/17 12:55 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),11 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2017
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/14 2:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair, upon Defendant Zee Law Group served on 4/3/2017, answer due 4/24/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Employee of Zee Law Group in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
10 10 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 02/22 2:40 PM
Effective March 1, 2017, Judge Abrams will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 780 on the 7th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 780 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 08/09 5:01 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Zee Law Group. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 08/09 12:29 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Counsel for Plaintiff shall immediately serve the complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 on all parties, including this Order on any new parties to the action and file the proofs of service pursuant to Local Rule 5-3.1 with the Court. (See order for further details). (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2016
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 08/01 11:48 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 08/01 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 08/01 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mona Amini on behalf of Plaintiff Khalid Zubair (Attorney Mona Amini added to party Khalid Zubair(pty:pla))(Amini, Mona)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 07/28 4:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 07/28 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair, identifying Defendant, Zee Law Group. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 07/28 4:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Kazerounian, Seyed)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/28 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18268083 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Khalid Zubair. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Khalid Zubair(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed)
Related: [-]