Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William S Duffey, Jr
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:16-cv-02768
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseFRCP 45(b) Application for enforcement of subpoena
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2016
Terminated:Sep 09, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 25, 2017 4:19 AM EST
Petitioner
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
W. Shawn Murnahan
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Madison Graham Loomis
Securities & Exchange Commission-Ga
contact info
Respondent
Megan M. Ruettiger
Represented By
Stephen D. Councill
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Julia Blackburn Stone
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Respondent
Securities Compliance Group, Ltd.
Represented By
Stephen D. Councill
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Julia Blackburn Stone
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Respondent
Adam S. Tracy
Represented By
Stephen D. Councill
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info
Julia Blackburn Stone
Rogers & Hardin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/26/2020 11:59 PM EST
Friday, September 09, 2016
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 09/09 10:08 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING6 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/09 10:09 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
6 6 4 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/08 11:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Murnahan, W.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
utility Case Reported Statistically Fri 07/29 4:33 PM
Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:16-mi-41-WSD-CMS. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/29 4:34 PM
Submission of1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause; and MOTION for an Order Requiring Respondents to Comply with Administrative Subpoenas, submitted to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
5 5 8 pgs RESPONSE re1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and for an Order Requiring Respondents Comply with Administrative Subpoenas filed by Megan M. Ruettiger, Securities Compliance Group, Ltd., Adam S. Tracy.(Councill, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Affidavit Ex 1 Tracy Declaration,
Att: 2 2 pgs Affidavit Ex 2 Ruettiger Declaration
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Blackburn Stone on behalf of Megan M. Ruettiger, Securities Compliance Group, Ltd., Adam S. Tracy (Stone, Julia)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Councill on behalf of Megan M. Ruettiger, Securities Compliance Group, Ltd., Adam S. Tracy (Councill, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2016
Submission of1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause; and MOTION for an Order Requiring Respondents to Comply with Administrative Subpoenas, submitted to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2016
2 2 5 pgs Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Murnahan, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
1 1 8 pgs MOTION for Order to Show Cause; and MOTION for an Order Requiring Respondents to Comply with Administrative Subpoenas with Memorandum In Support by Securities and Exchange Commission.(eop) Modified text on 6/17/2016 (eop). Modified file date on 6/23/2016 (eop).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration - Edward Saunders,
Att: 3 6 pgs Ex - A,
Att: 4 32 pgs Ex - B,
Att: 5 3 pgs Ex - C,
Att: 6 Ex - D,
Att: 7 Ex - E,
Att: 8 Ex - F,
Att: 9 Ex - G,
Att: 10 Ex - H,
Att: 11 Ex - I,
Att: 12 Ex - J,
Att: 13 Ex - K,
Att: 14 Ex - L,
Att: 15 Ex - M,
Att: 16 Ex - N,
Att: 17 Proposed Summons,
Att: 18 Civil Cover Sheet
No Payment Received; No Payment Required. re1 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (eop)
Related: [-]