Idaho District Court
Case #: 1:01-cv-00629
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 27, 2001
Terminated:May 13, 2004
Counter Claimant
Developers Surety&Indemnity Co
Counter Claimant
Interwest Supply, Inc
Counter Claimant
McCall, City of
Counter Defendant
Employers Insurance of Wausau
Cross Claimant
Arliss A St Clair
Cross Claimant
Cindy M St Clair
Cross Claimant
Dennis Ray St Clair
Cross Claimant
Developers Surety&Indemnity Co
Cross Claimant
Interwest Supply, Inc
Cross Claimant
Karen Elaine St Clair
Cross Claimant
McCall, City of
Cross Claimant
Randall T St Clair
Cross Claimant
St Clair Contractors, Inc
Cross Defendant
Interwest Supply, Inc
Cross Defendant
McCall, City of
Cross Defendant
St Clair Contractors, Inc
Defendant
Arliss A St Clair
Defendant
Cindy M St Clair
Defendant
Dennis Ray St Clair
Defendant
Developers Surety&Indemnity Co
Defendant
Interwest Supply, Inc
Defendant
Karen Elaine St Clair
Defendant
McCall, City of
Defendant
Randall T St Clair
Defendant
St Clair Contractors, Inc
Defendant
Thomas F St Clair
Plaintiff
Employers Insurance of Wausau
ThirdParty Defendant
Amcor Precast
ThirdParty Defendant
Old Castle Precast, Inc
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Arliss A St Clair
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Cindy M St Clair
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Dennis Ray St Clair
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Karen Elaine St Clair
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Randall T St Clair
ThirdParty Plaintiff
St Clair Contractors, Inc

GPO Oct 19 2006
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER : Granting 276 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Employers Insurance of Wausau, Deeming as moot 281 MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 3, 4, 8, 9&10 of Affidavit of Ron T. Blewett in Support of Wausau's Motion for Enforcement of Judgments filed by City of McCall. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
GPO Apr 23 2007
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 299 Motion to enforce judgment; It is further ordered, that St. Clairs motion for fees, costs, and prejudgment interest (Docket No. 218) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is granted to the extent it seeks fees in the sum of $203,697.50. It is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
GPO Dec 04 2007
MEMORANDUM DECISION. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
GPO Dec 04 2007
JUDGMENT Granting 303 MOTION for Taxation of Costs on Appeal filed by St Clair Contractors, Inc; Granting 304 MOTION for Taxation of Costs on Appeal filed by Employers Insurance of Wausau; Granting 319 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by St Clair Contractors, Inc; Deeming as moot 329 MOTION Withdraw Previously Filed Certificate of Record re 325 Certificate of Record on Appeal filed by Employers Insurance of Wausau; Granting 331 MOTION for Entry of Judgment filed by Employers Insurance of Wausau; Granting 333 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Re-Filed filed by Employers Insurance of Wausau; Granting 336 MOTION to Expedite, for Execution Orders, and for Writ filed by Employers Insurance of Wausau; Denying without prejudice 344 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by St Clair Contractors, Inc; Deeming as moot 369 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order and Affidavit in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order filed by City of McCall. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.