Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael M Mihm
Case #: 1:01-cv-01080
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1345 Foreclosure
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2001
Terminated:Jul 27, 2001

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Friday, August 30, 2002
29 29 NOTICE by plaintiff USA to court: we are taking no further action at this time in this case due to the pending Chapter 7 Bankruptcy filed on 8/19/02 (S, ilcd) Modified on 08/30/2002
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2002
28 28 Clerk's NOTICE of post-judgment continuing earnings garnishment by plaintiff USA (4 issued/sealed copies returned to FLU with certified copy of the Order of 8/16/02 (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/16/2002)
Related: [-]
27 27 WRIT of Continuing Earnings Garnishment issued as to Cheryl L Risner (4 certified copies issued/sealed and returned to FLU) (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER by Judge Michael M. Mihm. The United States has applied for a Writ of Continuing Earnings Garnishment; and it appears to the Court that the requirement of 28 USC Section 3205 are met and the proposed Writ conforms to the requirements of 28 USC Section 3205(c)(2). THEREFORE IT IS ORDERED that a Writ of Continuing Earnings Garnishment submitted by the government shall be issued. (cc: all counsel) (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
25 25 MEMORANDUM of Law IN SUPPORT of application for writ of continuing earnings garnishment [24-1] by plaintiff USA (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
24 24 APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Earnings Garnishment by plaintiff USA (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2002
23 23 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Cheryl L Risner on 7/30/02 (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2002
MINUTE-ENTRY: by Mag. Judge John A. Gorman: Due to Defendant's failure to appear, citation hearing not held . (cc: all counsel) (CAD, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2002
22 22 CITATION to DISCOVER ASSETS issued; returned to attorney for service: Hearing set for 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, 8/6/02 (CAD, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2002
21 21 RELEASE OF NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by plaintiff USA (CL, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2002
20 20 RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to transfer and disbursement of funds per decree confirming sale dated 4/1/02 (CL, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2002
19 19 ORDER/DECREE CONFIRMING REPORT OF SALE by Judge Michael M. Mihm. (cc: all counsel) (CL, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2002
18 18 UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S REPORT OF SALE filed with proposed Decree Confirming United States Marshal's Report of Sale (CAD, ilcd) Modified on 03/28/2002
Related: [-]
17 17 UNITED STATES MARSHAL'S CERTIFICATE OF PURCHASE (CAD, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 10, 2002
15 15 RETURN OF SERVICE executed on 1/9/02 re: foreclosure sale (CL, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2002
16 16 SERVICE by publication upon defendant Cheryl L Risner, defendant Robert Risner on 1/9/02 (CL, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2001
14 14 AMENDED USM REPORT ON SALE as to defendanst (CL, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2001
13 13 RETURN OF SERVICE unexecuted - attempted/sale cancelled and reset (WW, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2001
12 12 NOTICE of Marshal's Sale (WW, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2001
11 11 JUDGMENT in a civil case entered (cc: all counsel) (WW, ilcd)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER/DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE by Judge Michael M. Mihm granting motion for default judgment of foreclosure against Cheryl L Risner and Robert Risner [6-1]. Entry of default as to Cheryl L Risner and Robert Risner DEFAULT ENTERED. Case terminated. (cc: all counsel) (WW, ilcd)
Related: [-]
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Cheryl L Risner and Robert Risner (WW, ilcd) Modified on 07/30/2001
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2001
9 9 NOTICE of filing documents #6-#8 by plaintiff USA (HK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2001
8 8 AFFIDAVIT of Bradley W. Murphy regarding motion for default judgment of foreclosure against Cheryl L Risner, Robert Risner [6-1] (HK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
7 7 AFFIDAVIT of Military Service by Bradley W. Murphy regarding motion for default judgment of foreclosure against Cheryl L Risner, Robert Risner [6-1] (HK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION by plaintiff USA for default judgment of foreclosure against Cheryl L Risner, Robert Risner (HK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2001
5 5 RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Cheryl L Risner and, defendant Robert Risner on 4/18/01 (WW, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2001
4 4 SUMMONS issued as to all defendants and returned to plaintiff's attorney (WW, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2001
3 3 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT; Waiver(s) of Service due on 3/19/01 for Robert Risner and Cheryl L Risner (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of FORECLOSURE filed by plaintiff USA (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed. (RK, ilcd)
Related: [-]