Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 7:13-bk-70239
Case Filed:May 15, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Jul 23, 2013
Claims Deadline:Oct 21, 2013
Terminated:Nov 19, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Jul 08, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Hidalgo Logistics, LLC
PO Box 1648
1100 E Produce Rd
Hidalgo, TX 78557-1648
Represented By
John Kurt Stephen
Cardenas And Stephen, L.L.P.
contact info
Mynde Shaune Eisen
Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
Represented By
Barbara C Jue
Office Of U S Trustee
contact info
Stephen Douglas Statham
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Monday, January 11, 2016
251 251 misc Operating Report Mon 01/11 3:32 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period FINAL-PCR-October 2015 thru Nov. 19, 2015 Case Closing (Filed By Hidalgo Logistics, LLC ). (Stephen, John)
Related: [-]