Arizona District Court
Judge:Neil V Wake
Case #: 2:13-cv-01007
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:May 15, 2013
Re-opened:Dec 27, 2017
Terminated:Apr 10, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 9:05 PM MST
Defendant
Brenda DeGross
Represented By
Brian Christopher Fawber
Breyer Law Office
contact info
Mark Paul Breyer
Breyer Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Daniel DeGross
Represented By
Christian Knut Gamble Henrichsen
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Charles Jameson Gibbs
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Galen Huntington Satterlee
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Darren DeGross
Represented By
Christian Knut Gamble Henrichsen
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Charles Jameson Gibbs
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Galen Huntington Satterlee
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Dean DeGross
Represented By
Christian Knut Gamble Henrichsen
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Charles Jameson Gibbs
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Galen Huntington Satterlee
Ckgh Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Estate of David DeGross
Defendant
Mountain Vista Medical Center
Represented By
Michele A Molyneaux
Checkett Law Firm
contact info
John Joseph Checkett
Checkett Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Paul John Sheston
Checkett Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Donna Nystrom
2245 5th St.
Cumberland, WI 54829
Defendant
Christine St. John
individually and on behalf of her minor children: 108 N Meridian Rd., Apt. 214
Apache Junction, AZ 85120
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Joel Dominic DeCiancio
Deciancio Robbins PLC
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Society Insurance
Represented By
Timothy R Hyland
Kunz Plitt Hyland & Demlong PC
contact info
Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Daniel Maldonado
Kunz Plitt Hyland & Demlong PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Western General Insurance Company
Terminated: 03/24/2014
Represented By
Sean Patrick Healy
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Benjamin C Thomas
Thomas Thomas & Markson PC
contact info
Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Brian David Rubin
Thomas Thomas & Markson PC
contact info

GPO Sep 08 2016
ORDER that the Clerk shall pay to Society Insurance Company the sum of $500,000.00, which Society Insurance Company deposited with the Court on 05/27/14 (Doc. 68), plus any interest the deposit has accrued. The check shall be sent to Plaintiff's attorney. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the orders filed 04/24/14, and 07/29/14 (Docs. 67, 71). FURTHER ORDERED that the Request for Magistrate for Limited Purpose of Conducting Settlement Conference (Docs. 117, 118) is denied as moot. FURTHER ADJUDICATED that Defendants' time to file actions against James Sparish for claims arising out of the 02/06/13 motor vehicle collision is extended pursuant to A.R.S. § 12-504 (A) to six months from the date this order is entered. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the case. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V. Wake on 9/8/16. (NKS)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.