Colorado District Court
Judge:Christine M Arguello
Referred: Michael J Watanabe
Case #: 1:13-cv-01284
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0001 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 16, 2013
Re-opened:Oct 23, 2014
Terminated:Apr 23, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 8:35 PM MST
Counter Claimant
Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Represented By
Sarah H. Whiting
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Minneapolis
contact info
David Alan Allgeyer
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Minneapolis
contact info
Christopher Russell Smith
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Minneapolis
contact info
Counter Defendant
Karcher North America, Inc.
Represented By
Robert R. Brunelli
Sheridan Ross, P.C.
contact info
David Benjamin Kellis
Sheridan Ross, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nilfisk-Advance, Inc.
Represented By
Sarah H. Whiting
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Minneapolis
contact info
Patrick Compton
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Denver
contact info
David Alan Allgeyer
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Minneapolis
contact info
Christopher Russell Smith
Lindquist & Vennum, Pllp-Minneapolis
contact info
Plaintiff
Karcher North America, Inc.
Represented By
Robert R. Brunelli
Sheridan Ross, P.C.
contact info
David Benjamin Kellis
Sheridan Ross, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/09/2013 11:26 AM MDT
Thursday, May 16, 2013
Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Nilfisk-Advance, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3364706), filed by Karcher North America, Inc..(Brunelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alfred Karcher GmbH & Co. KG for Karcher North America, Inc.. (Brunelli, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Commissioner of Patents (dbera, )
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (dbera, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form