New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:13-bk-11649
Case Filed:May 20, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Jun 24, 2013
Claims Deadline:Oct 28, 2013
Terminated:Jan 08, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Dec 03, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
One Stop Facilities Maintenance Corp.
307 5th Ave Fl 7
New York, NY 10016-6517
Represented By
Jonathan S. Pasternak
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Julie Cvek Curley
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Erica Feynman Aisner
Delbello Donnellan Weingarten Wise & Wiederkehr, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Brian Shoichi Masumoto
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Thursday, August 04, 2016
217 217 notice Notice, Change of Address of Debtor/Creditor Mon 08/08 11:48 AM
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor filed by L&S Cleaning Service. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]