Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:13-cv-61132
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 20, 2013
Terminated:Apr 03, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 7:31 PM EST
Defendant
Ana Amador
Defendant
Michael Miracola
Defendant
Sasha Miracola
Represented By
Frank Anzalone
Broward County Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Zaida Pollack
Represented By
Nadja Prias
Casais & Prias PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Red Door Title Insurance Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff
FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC
2595 Brighton-Henrietta TL Road
Rochester, NY 14623
Represented By
James W. Brody
American Mortgage Law Group
contact info
W. Scott Turnbull
Crary Buchanan, P.A.
contact info
Greg W. Chambers
American Morgage Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, September 15, 2014
45 45 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC against Red Door Title Insurance Agency, Inc., Ana Amador, Michael Miracola Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/15/2014. (ra)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2014
44 44 MOTION for Default Judgment against Red Door Title Insurance, Agency, Inc., Michael Miracola, and Ana J. Amador by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC.(Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2014
43 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Sasha Miracola, aka Sasha Martinez, aka Graciela Martinez only by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC(Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
42 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Zaida Pollack only by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC(Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2014
41 41 ORDER CLOSING CASE UPON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/3/2014. (yha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2014
40 40 Sasha ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Sasha Miracola. (Anzalone, Frank)
Related: [-]
39 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting37 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. The Defendant Sasha Miracola must answer the Amended Complaint by February 10, 2014. The Clerk is instructed to lift the default against Defendant Sasha Miracola. The Court forewarns Defendant Sasha Miracola that if she fails to answer by February 10, 2014, the Court will reimpose the clerk's default and will be extremely reluctant to lift it in the future. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (rm00)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2014
38 38 Clerks Notice to Filer re37 Agreed MOTION to Set Aside Default by Clerk and Enlargement of Time to Answer Complaint . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ar2)
Related: [-]
37 37 AGREED MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Default by Sasha Miracola. (Anzalone, Frank). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint on 2/7/2014 (ar2).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2014
36 36 Clerks Entry of Default per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default as to Sasha Miracola, re35 Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/4/2014. (yha)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2014
35 35 Order Instructing Clerk to Enter Default(s) Against Defendant Sasha Miracola and Setting Forth Default Judgment Procedures Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/3/2014. (yha)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2014
34 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Zaida Pollack's answer, which was filed on January 30, 2014 is timely. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (rm00)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2014
33 33 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Zaida Pollack. (Prias, Nadja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2014
32 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re6 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by Zaida Pollack.(Prias, Nadja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2014
31 31 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS ZAIDA POLLACK AND SASHA MARTINEZ TO FILE ANSWER BY JANUARY 29, 2014 AT NOON MIAMI TIME, Sasha Miracola response due 1/29/2014; Zaida Pollack response due 1/29/2014. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/27/2014. (yha)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2014
30 30 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS ZAIDA POLLACK AND SASHA MARTINEZ TO FILE AN ANSWER BY JANUARY 24,2014 re28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Sasha Miracola response due 1/24/2014; Zaida Pollack response due 1/24/2014. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/17/2014. (yha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2014
29 29 STATUS REPORT Joint Interim Status Report by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2013
28 28 ORDER denying11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/11/2013. (yha)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2013
27 27 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: ( Jury Trial set for 9/22/2014 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 9/16/2014 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2013., Expert Discovery due by 7/7/2014., Fact Discovery due by 5/7/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2013., In Limine Motions due by 8/1/2014., Dispositive Motions due by 5/22/2014., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/12/2014., Status Report due by 1/2/2014.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/27/2014. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/4/2013. (yha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2013
26 26 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Case transferred to Judge Scola's paired Magistrate Judge Alicia Valle, pursuant to Administrative Order No. 2013-38. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 9/25/2013. (jmd)
Related: [-]
25 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION TO DISMISS17 Summons Returned Executed FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
24 24 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC(Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2013
23 23 NOTICE by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC of Joint Liability, with Certificate of Service (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2013
22 22 MOTION TO DISMISS17 Summons Returned Executed FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Sasha Miracola. Attorney Frank Anzalone added to party Sasha Miracola(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/23/2013 (Anzalone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2013
21 21 ORDER On Default Judgment Procedure Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/28/2013. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2013
20 20 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re19 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Ana Amador, Michael Miracola, Red Door Title Insurance Agency, Inc.. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/22/2013. (yha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2013
19 19 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Ana Amador, Michael Miracola, Red Door Title Insurance Agency, Inc. by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
18 18 Notice to the Court for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2013
17 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on6 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. Sasha Miracola served on 7/11/2013, answer due 8/1/2013. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
16 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. Red Door Title Insurance Agency, Inc. served on 5/29/2013, answer due 6/19/2013. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
15 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. Zaida Pollack served on 5/29/2013, answer due 6/19/2013. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
14 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. Michael Miracola served on 5/29/2013, answer due 6/19/2013. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
13 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. Ana Amador served on 6/3/2013, answer due 6/24/2013. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2013
12 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC. (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2013
11 11 MOTION TO DISMISS6 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Zaida Pollack. Responses due by 7/25/2013 (Prias, Nadja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2013
10 10 ORDER REQUIRING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery Proceedings Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/3/2013. (yha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2013
9 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Greg W. Chambers and James W. Brody are given permission to appear pro hac vice in this matter on behalf of FFC Mortgage Corporation. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 7/2/2013. (rm00)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2013
8 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Greg W. Chambers and James W. Brody. Filing Fee $ 150.00. Receipt # 4059. (ksa)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2013
7 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC re6 Amended Complaint with Service List (Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2013
6 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC.(Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2013
5 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nadja Prias on behalf of Zaida Pollack. Attorney Nadja Prias added to party Zaida Pollack(pty:dft). (Prias, Nadja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2013
4 4 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2013.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/30/2013. (yha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2013
3 3 Summons Issued as to Ana Amador, Michael Miracola, Sasha Miracola, Zaida Pollack, Red Door Title Insurance Agency, Inc.. (ail)
Related: [-]
2 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (ail)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-5734733, filed by FFC Mortgage Corporation, LLC.(Turnbull, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2