TRUE THE VOTE, INC. v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Reggie B Walton |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-00734 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 26:7428 IRS: Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2013 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 04, 2015 5:19 PM EST |
Defendant
FAYE NG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM WILKINS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DANIEL WERFEL
|
|
Defendant
UNKNOWN NAMED EMLPLOYEES OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CINDY M. THOMAS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOUGLAS H. SHULMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL SETO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HOLLY PAZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STEVEN T. MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SUSAN MALONEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LOIS LERNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STEVEN GRODNITZKY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DAVID FISH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANINE L. ESTES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RONALD BELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRUE THE VOTE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 07 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/7/2014. (lcrbw2) |
|
GPO
Oct 23 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 23, 2014. (lcrbw2) |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
266 | 266
respm
Reply to (non-motion) Document
Tue 04/23 3:30 PM
REPLY re262 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by BOPP LAW FIRM, PC. (Bopp, James) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
265 | 265
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 04/22 5:13 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re263 Motion for Hearing,262 Motion for Disbursement of Funds filed by FOLEY & LARDNER LLP. (Lockerby, Michael) |