Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry S Schermer
Case #: 4:12-bk-49981
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2012
Dismissed:May 13, 2013
Terminated:May 29, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Spruill's Properties, LLC
Craig Spruills 11507 Philmar
Saint Louis, MO 63138
Represented By
Rochelle D. Stanton
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee
111 South Tenth Street Suite 6353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 10/16/2012 1:57 PM CDT
Monday, October 15, 2012
1 1 31 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by Spruill's Properties, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 04/15/2013. Chapter 11 Plan due by 02/12/2013. Disclosure Statement due by 02/12/2013. (Stanton, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-49981 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt number 8604225, amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]