Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 3:13-bk-04653
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2013
Dismissed:Feb 26, 2015
Terminated:Mar 19, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GREEN ISLE INN, INC.
CALLE I #36 VILLAMAR ISLA VERDE
CAROLINA, PR 00979
Represented By
CARLOS J NAZARIO DIAZ
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
OFFICE OF THE US TRUSTEE (UST) OCHOA BUILDING 500 TANCA STREET SUITE 301
SAN JUAN, PR 00901


Docket last updated: 06/06/2013 3:16 PM AST
Thursday, June 06, 2013
1 1 24 pgs Voluntary petition under chapter 11 With Schedules, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $12500 Fee Amount $1213. Filed by CARLOS J NAZARIO DIAZ on behalf of GREEN ISLE INN, INC. (NAZARIO DIAZ, CARLOS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule SOFA
Att: 2 Exhibit LEGAL DESCR
Att: 3 List of 20 Largest Creditors TOP 20
Att: 4 Exhibit CREDITORS