Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 5:13-cv-00203
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2013
Terminated:Aug 27, 2014
Defendant
CHRIS LANDRUM
Defendant
FELICIA NOBLES
Defendant
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Defendant
JEFFERY T BEASLEY
Defendant
MICHAEL CREWS
Defendant
SAM CULPEPPER
Plaintiff
LUIS MUNUZURI HARRIS

GPO Nov 25 2013
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that Plaintiff's 31 Amended Motion Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order" be DENIED.( Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/23/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/25/2013. (jws)
GPO Dec 30 2014
ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's 31 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. This matter referred back to Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 12/30/2013. (jws)
GPO Jul 16 2014
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting re 47 Motion for Clarification of Case -- It is recommended that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Doc. 36, be GRANTED and this case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust administrative remedies before filing suit. R&R flag set. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/13/2014). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 7/16/2014. (kdm)
GPO Aug 27 2014
ORDER adopting 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; denying 49 Request for leave to file an amended complaint. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 8/27/2014. Concerning Plaintiffs claim that he should be transferred to a prison closer to his pre-incarceration residence, this claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). As to all other claims brought by Plaintiff, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust administrative remedies before filing suit, pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1997e. (kdm)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.