Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Bruce T Beesley
Case #: 3:13-bk-51138
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Jul 15, 2013
Claims Deadline:Oct 15, 2013
Dismissed:Mar 19, 2014
Terminated:Apr 07, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HASH LANE HOLDINGS, LLC, DBA LAKERIDGE GOLF COURSE
PO Box 10578
Reno, NV 89510-0578
Represented By
ALAN R SMITH
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509


Docket last updated: 06/07/2013 12:54 PM PDT
Thursday, June 06, 2013
1 1 93 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1213. Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of HASH LANE HOLDINGS, LLC, DBA LAKERIDGE GOLF COURSE (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Social Security Number(s). This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of HASH LANE HOLDINGS, LLC, DBA LAKERIDGE GOLF COURSE (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of HASH LANE HOLDINGS, LLC, DBA LAKERIDGE GOLF COURSE (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-51138 [misc,volp11pb] (1213.00). Receipt number 14110127, fee amount $1213.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
5 5 Document Corporate Resolution Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of HASH LANE HOLDINGS, LLC, DBA LAKERIDGE GOLF COURSE (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 Meeting of Creditors 341 Meeting to be held on 07/15/2013 at 02:00 PM at Young Bldg,Rm 3087. Last day to file Proof of Claims 10/15/2013.
Related: [-]