The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation v. Bank of America Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Naomi Reice Buchwald |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-03952 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2013 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 03, 2015 5:12 PM EST |
All Plaintiffs
Direct Action Plaintiffs
|
|
Defendant
Portigon AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSBC Bank Plc.
|
|
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lloyds Banking Group, PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lloyds TSB Bank PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Royal Bank of Canada
|
|
Defendant
Societe Generale
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Norinchukin Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS AG
|
|
Defendant
WestLB AG
|
|
Defendant
Non-Party Citibank, N.A.
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP 1633 Broadway
Brooklyn, NY 10019 |
|
Defendant
BBA Enterprises, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BBA Libor, Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Meyner and Landis LLP One Gateway Center Suite 2500
Newark, NJ 07102 |
|
Defendant
Bank of Scotland plc
|
|
Defendant
Barclays Bank plc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
British Bankers' Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Citigroup, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank, B.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse AG
|
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse International
|
|
Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Berkshire Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Direcors Financial Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
HSBC Holdings plc
Terminated: 12/24/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HBOS PLC
Terminated: 12/24/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG
Terminated: 12/24/2014
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
479 | 479
![]() RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch International Bank Ltd., Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al..(Burke, Arthur) |
|
478 | 478
![]() ***SELECTED PARTIES***RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by BBA Enterprises Ltd., BBA Libor Ltd., BBA Trent Ltd. (F.K.A. BBA LIBOR, Ltd.), Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Scotland plc, Barclays Bank Plc,, Bear Stearns Capital Markets, Inc., British Bankers' Association, COPERATIEVE RABOBANK UA (F.K.A. COPERATIEVE CENTRALE RAIFFEISEN-BOERENLEENBANK, B.A.), Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerleenbank, B.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, Creidt Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Direcors Financial Group, Direct Action Plaintiffs, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, HBOS Plc, HSBC Bank Plc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc,, J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lloyds Bank plc (F.K.A. Lloyds TSB Bank plc), Lloyds Banking Group plc, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch International, Merrill Lynch International Bank Ltd., NatWest Markets plc (F.K.A. The Royal Bank of Scotland plc), Portigon AG, Royal Bank of Canada, Vladimir Sklarov, Societe Generale, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., The Berkshire Bank, The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver, The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Ltd., The Norinchukin Bank, The Royal Bank of Scotland plc, UBS AG, UBS AG, BBA Libor, Ltd., Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, British Bankers Association, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Federal National Mortgage Association, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, BBA Enterprises, Ltd., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UJF Ltd., Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Capital, Inc., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank, B.A., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffseisen-Boerenleenbank, B.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, ICAP plc, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Bank Dublin PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Principal Capital Interest Only I, LLC, Principal Commercial Funding II, LLC, Principal Commercial Funding, LLC, Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Financial Services, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal Real Estate Investors, LLC, R.P. Martin Holdings Ltd., RBS Securities, Inc., Societe Generale, S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Tullett Prebon PLC, UBS Securities LLC, WestDeutsche Immobilienbank AG, WestLB AG, LLoyds Bank PLC, PFI Bond & Mortgage Securities Fund, PFI Bond Market Index Fund, PFI Core Plus Bond I Fund, PFI Diversified Real Asset Fund, PFI Equity Income Fund, PFI Global Diversified Income Fund, PFI Government & High Quality Bond Fund, PFI High Yield Fund, PFI High Yield Fund I, PFI Income Fund, PFI Inflation Protection Fund, PFI Money Market Fund, PFI Preferred Securities Fund, PFI Short-Term Income Fund, PRINCIPAL VARIABLE CONTRACTS FUND, INC., PVC Asset Allocation Account, PVC Balanced Account, PVC Bond & Mortgage Securities Account, PVC Equity Income Account, PVC Government & High Quality Bond Account, PVC Income Account, PVC Money Market Account, PVC Short-Term Income Account, Principal Funds, Inc., Societe General, S.A., BBA Libor, Ltd, BBA Trent LTD., Cooperatieve Rabobank UA, Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank, B.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Lloyds Banking Group, PLC, NatWest Markets plc, Societe Generale, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Tokyo Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Barclays PLC, Bucks County Water and Sewer Authority, Carpenters Pension Fund of West Virginia, Citibank NA, Citigroup Inc., Citizens Bank N.A., Citizens Bank, N.A., City of Dania Beach Police & Firefighters' Retirement System, City of New Britain, City of New Britain Firefighters' and Police Benefit Fund, Courmont & Wapner Associates, L.P., Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Roberto E. Calle Gracey, Insulators and Asbestos Workers Local #14, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Lloyds Bank plc (f/k/a Lloyds TSB Bank plc), Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Metzler Investment GmbH, Ravan Investments, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Virgin Islands Public Finance Authority,, 303 Proprietary Trading LLC, 303030 Trading LLC, 33-35 Green Pond Road Associates, LLC, AVP Properties, LLC, Annie Bell Adams, All Defendants, Joseph Amabile, Louie Amabile, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Todd Augenbaum, Axiom FX Investment 2X Fund, L.P., Axiom FX Investment Fund II, L.P., Axiom FX Investment Fund, L.P., Axiom HFT LLC, Axiom Investment Advisors Holdings L.P., Axiom Investment Advisors, LLC, Axiom Investment Company, LLC, Axion Investment Company Holdings L.P., BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BNP Paribas S.A., Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank Of America Securities LLC, Bank of America Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans, Bank of America National Association, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of Nova Scotia, Bank of Tokyo-Mistsubishi UFJ, Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Barclays Bank Plc., Barclays Capital (Cayman) Limited, Barclays Capital Inc., Barclays U.S. Funding LLC, Barklays Bank Plc, Bay Area Toll Authority, Jeffrey D. Buckley, Norman Byster, CEMA Joint Venture, CITI SWAPCO INC., Michael Cahill, California Public Plaintiffs, Roberto E. Calle Gracey, Capital Ventures International, Linda Carr, Cement Masons' International Association Employees' Trust Fund, Centrale Raiffeisen-Berenleenbank B.A., Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Charles Schwab Corporation, Charles Schwab Worldwide Funds PLC, Chase Bank USA, NA, Citi Swapco Inc., Citibank N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Funding Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Inc, Citiigroup Global Markets Inc., Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, City of Houston, City of Philadelphia, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, Kenneth W. Coker, Community Bank & Trust, Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A. (n/k/a Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.), Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boernleenbank B.A., Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisenboernleenbank B.A., Cooperative Rabobank U.A., Coperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., County of Mendocino, County of Riverside, County of Sacramento, County of Sacramento, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, Courtyard at Amwell II, LLC, Credit Argicole, S.A., Credit Suisse (USA) Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Group, AG, Credit Suisse Group, NA, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) Inc., DB Group Services (UK) Limited, Darby Financial Products, Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP, Richard Deogracias, Deutsche Bank Financial LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Direct Action Plaintiff, Directors Financial Group(on behalf of all others similarly situated), Directors Financial Group(individually), Does 1-10, Inclusive, Heather M. Earle, East Bay Municipal Utility District, FDIC, as receiver, FTC Capital GMBH, FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, Federal Deposit Insurance, Marc Federighi, Scott Federighi, Dennis Paul Fobes, Leigh E. Fobes, Gary Francis, Eric Friedman, Robert Furlong, Lawrence W. Gardner, Ellen Gelboim, Ephraim F. Gildor, Gildor Family Advisors L.P., Gildor Family Company L.P., Gildor Management, LLC, Fran P. Goldsleger, David Gough, Greenwich Commons II, LLC, Guaranty Bank & Trust Company, Betty L. Gunter, HBOS Plc., HSBC Finance Corp., HSBC Holding plc, HSBC Holdings plc., HSBC Holdings, PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC USA Inc., Brian Haggerty, Hawaii Annuity Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Nathaniel Haynes, John Henderson, Richard Hershey, Highlander Realty, LLC, ICAP, ICAP Europe Ltd., J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan & Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Jill Court Associates II, LLC, John Does 1-5, David Klusendorf, Ronald Krug, Margaret Lambert, Christopher Lang, Jeffrey Laydon, Elizabeth Lieberman(on behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated), Elizabeth Lieberman, Lloyds Bank PLC (formerly known as Lloyds TSB Bank PLC), Lloyds Bank Plc, Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Banking Group plc., Maidencreek Ventures II LP, Maimonides Medical Center, Henryk Malinowski, Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Brian McCormick, Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd., Metzler Investment GmbH, John Monckton, Mr. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Stephanie Nagel, National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund, National Association, National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, National Credit Union Administration Board, Norinchukin Bank, Philip Olson, PRUDENTIAL CORE TAXABLE MONEY MARKET FUND, PRUDENTIAL INVESTMENT PORTFOLIOS 2, Brett Pankau, Carl A. Payne, Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, Pension Trust for Operating Engineers, Nicholas Pesa, Portigon AG f/k/a WestLB AG, Portigon/WestLB AG, Principal Financial Group, Inc., Principal Life Insurance Company, Principal Variable Contracts Funds, Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, RBS Citizens, N.A., RBS Citizens, N.A. (f/k/a Citizens Bank of Massachusetts), RBS Citizens, NA, Rabobank Group, Rabobank International, Raritan Commons, LLC, Eduardo Restani, Royal Bank of Scotland, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, SEIU Pension Plans Master Trust, Salix Capital US Inc., San Diego Association of Governments, San Mateo Couty Joint Powers Financing Authority, Schlesinger Law Offices, P.A., Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investments, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Yieldplus Fund, Schwab Yieldplus Fund Liquidation Trust, Societe General, Royal Bank of Canada, Societe Generale S.A., Vito Spillone, Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corp., David E. Sundstrom, Margery Teller, Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC, The Bank of Tokyo Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd. (n/k/a MUFG Bank, Ltd.), The Berkshire Bank(Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated), The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Charles Schwab Family of Funds, The Charles Schwab Family of Funds, The City of Philadelphia, The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation, Ltd., The Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, The Regents of the University of California, The Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority, The Royal Bank of Canada, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group Plc., The Royal Bank of Scotland, Plc, Tradition America LLC, Triaxx Prime CDO 2006-1 ltd., Triaxx Prime CDO 2006-2 Ltd., Triaxx Prime CDO 2007-1 Ltd., Tullett Liberty Brokerage Inc., Tullett Prebon Americas Corp., Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC, UBS AG, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS Group AG, UBS Limited, Maxwell Van De Velde, David Vecchione, Vistra Energy Corp., Jerry Weglarz, Nathan Weglarz, WestLB AG (n/k/a Portigon AG), Westdeutsche ImmobilienBank AG (n/k/a Westdeutsche Immobilien Servicing AG), Randall Williams, Yale University, Linda Zacher, citigroup Financial Products. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 4556 .(Burke, Arthur) |
|
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
477 | 477
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Haines on behalf of Portigon AG, Portigon AG f/k/a WestLB AG, Portigon/WestLB AG, WestDeutsche Immobilienbank AG, WestLB AG, WestLB AG (n/k/a Portigon AG), Westdeutsche ImmobilienBank AG (n/k/a Westdeutsche Immobilien Servicing AG). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02262-NRB, 1:13-cv-03952-NRB, 1:14-cv-01757-NRB.(Haines, Aaron) |