California Central District Court
Judge:Margaret M Morrow
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:13-cv-04292
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Injunctive/Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2013
Terminated:Jul 10, 2013
Last checked: Saturday Jan 03, 2015 11:51 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Dow Corning Corporation
Represented By
Kathleen Balderrama
Alliant Asset Management
contact info
Plaintiff
Nusil Technology LLC
Represented By
Alan A Blakeboro
Reicker Pfau Pyle And Mcroy LLP
contact info
Robert Behrooz Forouzandeh
Reicker Pfau Pyle And Mcroy LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James S Smith
Represented By
Alan A Blakeboro
Reicker Pfau Pyle And Mcroy LLP
contact info
Robert Behrooz Forouzandeh
Reicker Pfau Pyle And Mcroy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/01/2013 8:50 PM PDT
Friday, June 14, 2013
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Santa Barbara Anacapa Division, case number 1417059 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Defendant Dow Corning Corporation. (et) (ds).
Related: [-]
2 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dow Corning Corporation, identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company, Other Affiliate Corning Incorporated for Dow Corning Corporation. (et) (ds).
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS OR PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Dow Corning Corporation. (et) (ds).
Related: [-]
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dow Corning Corporation, re Notice of Removal,1 , Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties2 and civil cover sheet served on 6/14/2013. (et) (ds).
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]